USA v. Jeanne Germeil
Defendant / Appellant: JEANNE E. GERMEIL
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-14942
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [19-14942] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 12/13/2019 11:25 AM]
December 12, 2019 CJA appointment issued by this court to Attorney Richard Lawrence Rosenbaum for Appellant Jeanne E. Germeil. [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:08 PM]
December 11, 2019 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jeanne E. Germeil on 12/11/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Jeanne Germeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JEANNE E. GERMEIL
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
Represented By: Emily M. Smachetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?