Kenneth Mabs, et al v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: TERRY MABS, Wife, CATHERINE BRICKER, Wife, RICK MICHALSON, Husband and KENNETH MABS, Husband
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Defendant / Appellee: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC., SKY SAFARI TOURS, INC. and VACATION & TOUR CONSULTANTS (ST. KITTS), d.b.a. Kantours
Case Number: 20-10645
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 04/07/2020 02:47 PM]
April 3, 2020 Appendix filed [2 VOLUMES] by Appellants Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 04/03/2020 02:25 PM]
April 2, 2020 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 04/02/2020 02:02 PM]
March 31, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Joseph Sales for Appellants Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. [Entered: 03/31/2020 09:53 AM]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Civil Appeal Statement filed by Appellants Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs, Rick Michalson and Catherine Bricker is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9029715-2 ] [Entered: 03/31/2020 08:57 AM]
March 30, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. [Entered: 04/03/2020 09:44 AM]
March 27, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by Kenneth Mabs and Rick Michalson. [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/27/2020 11:50 AM]
March 12, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Catherine J. MacIvor for Appellee Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10645] (ECF: Catherine MacIvor) [Entered: 03/12/2020 05:11 PM]
March 11, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael John Dono for Appellees Sky Safari Tours, Inc. and Vacation & Tour Consultants (St. Kitts). On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10645] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 03/11/2020 06:17 PM]
March 9, 2020 MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement form Out of Time filed by Catherine Bricker, Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs and Rick Michalson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9029715-1] [20-10645]--[Edited 03/11/2020 by TLR to add the correct relief] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/09/2020 05:42 PM]
March 9, 2020 Attorney David Joseph Sales for Appellants Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs, Rick Michalson and Catherine Bricker has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 03/09/2020 02:51 PM]
March 4, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Noah Silverman for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. [20-10645] (ECF: Noah Silverman) [Entered: 03/04/2020 04:15 PM]
March 4, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Catherine J. MacIvor for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. [20-10645] (ECF: Catherine MacIvor) [Entered: 03/04/2020 03:59 PM]
March 4, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Joseph Sales for Catherine Bricker, Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs and Rick Michalson. [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:04 AM]
March 4, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael John Dono for Appellees Vacation and Tours Consultants (St. Kitts) Ltd. and Sky Safari Tours, Inc. [20-10645] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 03/04/2020 10:51 AM]
March 3, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to David Joseph Sales for Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs, Rick Michalson and Catherine Bricker. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:22 PM]
March 3, 2020 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, David Joseph Sales for Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs, Rick Michalson and Catherine Bricker is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. Additionally, your appearance of counsel form must be submitted using the 11th Circuit Appearance of Counsel Form. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed and the Appearance of Counsel is resubmited utilizing the 11th Circuit form. [Entered: 03/03/2020 01:52 PM]
March 3, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by David J. Sales on behalf of Appellants, Catherine Bricker, Rick Michalson, Kenneth Mabs and Terry Mabs. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:42 PM]
March 3, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David J. Sales representing Appellants, Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs, Catherine Bricker, and Rick Michalson [20-10645] (ECF: David Sales) [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:40 PM]
February 21, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 02/19/2020 as to Appellant Catherine Bricker. [Entered: 02/21/2020 02:27 PM]
February 19, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Catherine Bricker, Kenneth Mabs, Terry Mabs and Rick Michalson on 02/19/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/30/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/04/2020 as to Appellant Catherine Bricker. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/18/2020 as to Appellees Celebrity Cruises, Inc. and Sky Safari Tours, Inc. [Entered: 02/21/2020 02:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenneth Mabs, et al v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY MABS, Wife
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: David P. Vitale Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CATHERINE BRICKER, Wife
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Elise Sherr Allison
Represented By: David P. Vitale Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICK MICHALSON, Husband
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Elise Sherr Allison
Represented By: David P. Vitale Jr.
Represented By: David Joseph Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH MABS, Husband
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Elise Sherr Allison
Represented By: David P. Vitale Jr.
Represented By: David Joseph Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Russell M. Landy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Represented By: Noah D. Silverman
Represented By: Jeffrey Eric Foreman
Represented By: Catherine J. MacIvor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SKY SAFARI TOURS, INC.
Represented By: Spencer Burgess Price
Represented By: Carlos Javier Chardon
Represented By: Michael John Dono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VACATION & TOUR CONSULTANTS (ST. KITTS), d.b.a. Kantours
Represented By: Spencer Burgess Price
Represented By: Carlos Javier Chardon
Represented By: Michael John Dono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?