Terri Mollica v. USA
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner / Appellant: TERRI MCGUIRE MOLLICA
Case Number: 20-10787
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael B. Billingsley for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10787] (ECF: Michael Billingsley) [Entered: 04/24/2020 10:15 AM]
April 7, 2020 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Terri McGuire Mollica was filed on 04/07/2020. Docket Entry 50. [Entered: 04/07/2020 02:43 PM]
March 31, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10787] (ECF: Michael Billingsley) [Entered: 03/31/2020 11:55 AM]
March 27, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Michael B. Billingsley for USA and U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama for USA. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/27/2020 08:26 PM]
March 24, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Billingsley for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama for USA. [20-10787] (ECF: Michael Billingsley) [Entered: 03/24/2020 04:40 PM]
March 18, 2020 This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 03/18/2020 10:44 AM]
March 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Terri McGuire Mollica. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/16/2020 02:23 PM]
February 28, 2020 USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Terri McGuire Mollica was filed on 06/13/2019. Docket Entry 28. [Entered: 02/28/2020 12:15 PM]
February 27, 2020 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Terri McGuire Mollica on 02/27/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Terri Mollica v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama
Represented By: Michael B. Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TERRI MCGUIRE MOLLICA
Represented By: Terri McGuire Mollica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?