Avery Bradford v. Clinton Perry
Petitioner / Appellant: AVERY BRADFORD
Respondent / Appellee: CLINTON PERRY
Case Number: 20-10971
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Avery Bradford. [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:49 AM]
March 18, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Matthew Crowder for Clinton Perry, Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10971] (ECF: Matthew Crowder) [Entered: 03/18/2020 10:39 AM]
March 17, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Crowder, Matthew B. for Clinton Perry, Warden [20-10971] (ECF: Matthew Crowder) [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:49 PM]
March 10, 2020 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Avery Bradford on 03/04/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 03/16/2020 02:19 PM]
March 10, 2020 USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Avery Bradford was filed on 02/13/2020. Docket Entry 33. [Entered: 03/16/2020 02:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Avery Bradford v. Clinton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: AVERY BRADFORD
Represented By: Avery Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CLINTON PERRY
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Matthew Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?