Tony Barksdale v. Attorney General, State of Ala, et al
Respondent / Appellee: HOLMAN CF WARDEN, ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA and COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Petitioner / Appellant: TONY BARKSDALE
Case Number: 20-10993
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 24, 2024 Tony Barksdale v. Attorney General, State of Ala, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Tony Barksdale. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9066444-1] [20-10993] (ECF: Steven Schneebaum) [Entered: 04/20/2020 05:27 PM]
April 9, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Beth Jackson Hughes for Appellees Attorney General, State of Alabama, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections and Holman CF Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10993] (ECF: Beth Hughes) [Entered: 04/09/2020 04:08 PM]
April 3, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Steven Marc Schneebaum for Appellant Tony Barksdale. No hearings. [Entered: 04/03/2020 08:49 AM]
April 2, 2020 Notice of Deficiency: Transcript Order Form "NOT" filed by Steven Marc Schneebaum for Tony Barksdale .Please file a Transcript Information Form in the District Court, as required by Fed.R.App.P. 10(b)(1); a Transcript Information Form is available from the district court clerk. Appellant is required to file and serve copies of the form in accordance with the instructions included on the form. [Entered: 04/02/2020 11:52 AM]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file motion for COA filed by Appellant Tony Barksdale is GRANTED. [ # 9044472-2 ] Appellant's motion for a COA due on 04/20/2020. EEC [Entered: 03/30/2020 05:38 PM]
March 26, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Steven Marc Schneebaum for Tony Barksdale. [20-10993] (ECF: Steven Schneebaum) [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:38 PM]
March 25, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10993] (ECF: Steven Schneebaum) [Entered: 03/25/2020 04:25 PM]
March 25, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability to 04/20/2020 filed by Tony Barksdale. Motion is Unopposed. [9044472-1] [20-10993] (ECF: Steven Schneebaum) [Entered: 03/25/2020 05:53 PM]
March 16, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 03/13/2020 as to Appellant Tony Barksdale. [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:33 PM]
March 16, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Beth Jackson Hughes for Attorney General, State of Alabama, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections and Holman CF Warden. [20-10993] (ECF: Beth Hughes) [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:41 PM]
March 12, 2020 DEATH PENALTY APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Steven Marc Schneebaum for Appellant Tony Barksdale on 03/11/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 03/13/2020 03:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tony Barksdale v. Attorney General, State of Ala, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: HOLMAN CF WARDEN
Represented By: Beth Jackson Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Beth Jackson Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Beth Jackson Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TONY BARKSDALE
Represented By: Willa Perlmutter
Represented By: Steven Marc Schneebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?