USA v. Melvin Hardy
Defendant / Appellant: MELVIN HARDY, a.k.a. Kevin Bowens
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-11503
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 11, 2020 USA v. Melvin Hardy, Jr.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Billingsley for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama for USA. [20-11503] (ECF: Michael Billingsley) [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:48 PM]
April 21, 2020 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Melvin Hardy on 04/21/2020. Fee Status: IFP Granted. Appellant brief due 40 days from 04/21/2020. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 04/24/2020 08:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Melvin Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MELVIN HARDY, a.k.a. Kevin Bowens
Represented By: Melvin Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama
Represented By: Michael B. Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?