Gricelia Garcia-Berrios v. U.S. Attorney General
Petitioner: GRICELIA GARCIA-BERRIOS
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 20-11943
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Miguel Angel Mendizabal Freire for Gricelia Garcia-Berrios. [20-11943] (ECF: Miguel Mendizabal Freire) [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:16 PM]
May 29, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Miguel Angel Mendizabal Freire for Petitioner Gricelia Garcia-Berrios. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11943] (ECF: Miguel Mendizabal Freire) [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:14 PM]
May 28, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicole J. Thomas-Dorris for USA [20-11943] (ECF: Nicole Thomas-Dorris) [Entered: 05/28/2020 06:07 PM]
May 28, 2020 Notice of receipt of BIA Order, Immigration Judge's Order and Notice to Appear filed by Miguel Angel Mendizabal Freire for Gricelia Garcia-Berrios [20-11943] --[Edited 05/29/2020 by LA to reflect the documents received marked as Exhibit 1 and not the Administrative Agency Record on Appeal event chosen by Petitioner's counsel] (ECF: Miguel Mendizabal Freire) [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:33 PM]
May 27, 2020 AGENCY PETITION / APPLICATION DOCKETED. Filed by Petitioner Gricelia Garcia-Berrios. Additional Documents Needed: Notice to Appear, IJ Order and BIA Order. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gricelia Garcia-Berrios v. U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: OIL
Represented By: Michelle Ressler
Represented By: Thomas W. Hussey
Represented By: Ian D. Fiske
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Moore
Represented By: Nicole Thomas-Dorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GRICELIA GARCIA-BERRIOS
Represented By: Miguel Angel Mendizabal Freire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?