Jimmie Jackson, Jr. v. L.P.S. Services, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: L.P.S. SERVICES, INC., d.b.a. Lanier Parking Solutions
Plaintiff / Appellant: JIMMIE L. JACKSON, JR.
Case Number: 20-12157
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 TRANSCRIPTS FILED on 7/29/2020; TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 07/13/2018, before Judge Janet F. King; TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/06/2018; Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter, [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:30 PM]
August 3, 2020 Notice of receipt: Letter as to Appellant Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. [Entered: 08/06/2020 09:18 AM]
July 30, 2020 Notice of receipt: Letter as to Appellant Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. [Entered: 07/31/2020 05:05 PM]
July 30, 2020 Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. [Entered: 07/31/2020 05:03 PM]
July 30, 2020 MOTION to dismiss appeal as untimely filed by L.P.S. Services, Inc.. Motion is Opposed. [9150492-1] [20-12157] (ECF: Fletcher Howard) [Entered: 07/30/2020 12:23 PM]
July 28, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:24 PM]
July 22, 2020 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Jana Colter, 07/07/2020, Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr., Other Hearings 12/11/2018. [Entered: 07/22/2020 05:23 PM]
July 21, 2020 Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Jana Colter as to Appellant Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 07/02/2020. [Entered: 07/21/2020 12:27 PM]
July 14, 2020 Notice of receipt: Letter regarding transcript. Transcript has been requested as to Appellant Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. [Entered: 07/15/2020 02:18 PM]
July 14, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr., Court Reporter: Jana Colter, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 12/11/2018. [Entered: 07/14/2020 02:48 PM]
July 14, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/14/2020 02:26 PM]
July 8, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 07/08/2020 04:29 PM]
July 6, 2020 Notice of Change of Address for Party Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. [Entered: 07/08/2020 06:35 PM]
July 6, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Fletcher Beaumont Howard for Appellee L.P.S. Services, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12157] (ECF: Fletcher Howard) [Entered: 07/06/2020 12:52 PM]
July 6, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Fletcher Beaumont Howard for L.P.S. Services, Inc.. [20-12157] (ECF: Fletcher Howard) [Entered: 07/06/2020 11:12 AM]
June 25, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/25/2020 08:38 AM]
June 16, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 06/08/2020 as to Appellant Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr.. [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:15 AM]
June 10, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jimmie L. Jackson, Jr. on 06/08/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/24/2020 as to Appellant Jimmie L. Jackson Jr.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/08/2020 as to Appellee L.P.S. Services, Inc. [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jimmie Jackson, Jr. v. L.P.S. Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: L.P.S. SERVICES, INC., d.b.a. Lanier Parking Solutions
Represented By: Desmond Mariona Dennis
Represented By: Fletcher Beaumont Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIMMIE L. JACKSON, JR.
Represented By: Jimmie L. Jackson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?