Samuel Laidler v. Dillihuat, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CAIN, All in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their official capacities, SHOEMAKER, All in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their official capacities, JACKSON, Warden of Security, all in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their official capacities, FUGITT, All in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their official capacities and DILLIHUAT, All in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their offiical capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: SAMUEL L. LAIDLER
Case Number: 20-12282
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The court finds the the appeal as frivolous, DENIES leave to proceed and DISMISSES the appeal (see attached order for complete text) [ # 9135070-2 ] CRW, KCN and RJL [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:33 PM]
July 17, 2020 Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Samuel L. Laidler. [Entered: 07/21/2020 01:22 PM]
July 6, 2020 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal construed from appellants consent form filed by Appellant Samuel L. Laidler. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9135070-1] [Entered: 07/13/2020 12:06 PM]
July 6, 2020 Consent Form filed by Appellant Samuel L. Laidler. [Entered: 07/13/2020 11:58 AM]
July 6, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Samuel L. Laidler. [Entered: 07/13/2020 11:56 AM]
July 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Samuel L. Laidler. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/06/2020 12:33 PM]
June 23, 2020 USDC Order Denying appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees NOT Assessed. Filed on 06/05/2020. Docket Entry 21. [Entered: 06/23/2020 03:04 PM]
June 16, 2020 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Samuel L. Laidler on 06/15/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 06/23/2020 02:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Samuel Laidler v. Dillihuat, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAIN, All in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHOEMAKER, All in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACKSON, Warden of Security, all in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FUGITT, All in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DILLIHUAT, All in their personal capacities, individual capacities and their offiical capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAMUEL L. LAIDLER
Represented By: Samuel L. Laidler
Represented By: Georgia SP Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?