Rhonda Reid v. Candace Lawson, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: RHONDA REID
Defendant / Appellee: STEPHEN BRADLEY, DA, DONNIE HARRISON, Sheriff, CAMILLE HOPE, Bankruptcy Trustee, CANDACE LAWSON, Greene County Tax Commissioner, RENE MATHEW, State Revenue, LAVERNE OGLETREE and BILL MASSEE
Case Number: 20-12350
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 24, 2021 Rhonda Reid v. Candace Lawson, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellees Donnie Harrison, Candace Lawson, Bill Massee and Laverne Ogletree. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 08/18/2020 10:29 AM]
August 17, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees Donnie Harrison, Candace Lawson, Bill Massee and Laverne Ogletree. [Entered: 08/18/2020 10:29 AM]
August 14, 2020 Supplemental Appendix [2 VOLUMES] filed by Appellees Donnie Harrison, Candace Lawson, Bill Massee and Laverne Ogletree. [20-12350] (ECF: Kenneth Robin) [Entered: 08/14/2020 02:31 PM]
August 14, 2020 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees Donnie Harrison, Candace Lawson, Bill Massee and Laverne Ogletree. [20-12350] (ECF: Kenneth Robin) [Entered: 08/14/2020 02:01 PM]
August 12, 2020 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Appellee Camille Hope. Her brief is now due on 9/14/2020. [Entered: 08/12/2020 11:53 AM]
July 15, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by Rhonda Reid. Service date: 07/15/2020 [20-12350] Attorney for Appellee: Klatzkow - US mail; Attorney for Appellee: Robin - US mail; Appellee Hope - US mail. [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:24 PM]
July 15, 2020 Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES - 1 copies] by Party Rhonda Reid. Service date: 07/08/2020 US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Klatzkow, Robin, Hope. [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:35 PM]
July 8, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kenneth Paul Robin for Appellees Donnie Harrison and Candace Lawson. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12350] (ECF: Kenneth Robin) [Entered: 07/08/2020 03:51 PM]
July 8, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kenneth Paul Robin for Donnie Harrison and Candace Lawson. [20-12350] (ECF: Kenneth Robin) [Entered: 07/08/2020 03:49 PM]
July 8, 2020 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Rhonda Reid. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/11/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 07/08/2020 09:23 AM]
July 8, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 07/02/2020 as to Appellant Rhonda Reid. [Entered: 07/08/2020 08:41 AM]
July 2, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Rhonda Reid. [Entered: 07/07/2020 12:30 PM]
June 24, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Rhonda Reid on 06/24/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/08/2020 as to Appellant Rhonda Reid. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/22/2020 as to Appellees Donnie Harrison and Candace Lawson [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rhonda Reid v. Candace Lawson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RHONDA REID
Represented By: Rhonda Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN BRADLEY, DA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONNIE HARRISON, Sheriff
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Robin
Represented By: Melissa Klatzkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAMILLE HOPE, Bankruptcy Trustee
Represented By: Camille Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CANDACE LAWSON, Greene County Tax Commissioner
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Robin
Represented By: Melissa Klatzkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RENE MATHEW, State Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAVERNE OGLETREE
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL MASSEE
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?