Fred Brooks v. Warden, et al
Defendant / Appellee: SHEPARD, Assistant Regional Director, GDCP, J. GOODY, Correctional Counselor, GDCP, WILLIAM POWELL, Deputy Warden, GDCP, BRUCE CHATMAN, GD&CP, MICHAEL CANNON, Superintendent, GDCP, JUNE BISHOP, MELINDA DAVIS, Regional Director, GDCP and WARDEN, GDCP
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRED DALTON BROOKS
Case Number: 20-12352
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Fred Dalton Brooks. [Entered: 08/12/2020 06:52 AM]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction (see attached order for complete text). BCG, RJL and BL [Entered: 08/06/2020 12:26 PM]
July 24, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Attorney Matthew Boyer for Appellees William Powell, June Bishop and Bruce Chatman have/has been conditional filed. Document(s) will be returned if appearance of counsel has not been received within 14 days. [Entered: 07/24/2020 06:36 AM]
July 24, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Boyer for June Bishop, Bruce Chatman and William Powell. [20-12352] (ECF: Matthew Boyer) [Entered: 07/24/2020 09:53 AM]
July 23, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew Boyer for Appellees June Bishop, Bruce Chatman and William Powell. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12352] (ECF: Matthew Boyer) [Entered: 07/23/2020 04:13 PM]
July 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Matthew Boyer for William Powell, June Bishop and Bruce Chatman, Christopher Michael Carr for William Powell, Warden, June Bishop, Bruce Chatman, Michael Cannon, Melinda Davis, Shepard and J. Goody, Elizabeth McRary Crowder for William Powell, Warden, June Bishop, Michael Cannon, Melinda Davis, Shepard and J. Goody, Angela Ellen Cusimano for Bruce Chatman, Meghan Robson Davidson for William Powell, Michael T. Davis for Warden, June Bishop, Michael Cannon, Melinda Davis, Shepard and J. Goody, Laura Louise Lones for William Powell, June Bishop and Bruce Chatman and Amy L. Macrina for Warden, June Bishop, Michael Cannon, Melinda Davis, Shepard and J. Goody. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/23/2020 09:20 AM]
July 23, 2020 USDC Motion filed by appellant for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees or consent form. Filed on 07/20/2020. Docket Entry 181. [Entered: 07/23/2020 09:18 AM]
July 9, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Fred Dalton Brooks. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/09/2020 08:03 AM]
July 8, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Fred Dalton Brooks. [Entered: 07/09/2020 12:48 PM]
June 24, 2020 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Fred Dalton Brooks on 06/24/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 06/26/2020 07:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Fred Brooks v. Warden, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHEPARD, Assistant Regional Director, GDCP
Represented By: Amy L. Macrina
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. GOODY, Correctional Counselor, GDCP
Represented By: Amy L. Macrina
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM POWELL, Deputy Warden, GDCP
Represented By: Laura Louise Lones
Represented By: Meghan Robson Davidson
Represented By: Matthew Boyer
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUCE CHATMAN, GD&CP
Represented By: Laura Louise Lones
Represented By: Matthew Boyer
Represented By: Angela Ellen Cusimano
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL CANNON, Superintendent, GDCP
Represented By: Amy L. Macrina
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUNE BISHOP
Represented By: Amy L. Macrina
Represented By: Laura Louise Lones
Represented By: Matthew Boyer
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELINDA DAVIS, Regional Director, GDCP
Represented By: Amy L. Macrina
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN, GDCP
Represented By: Amy L. Macrina
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRED DALTON BROOKS
Represented By: Fred Dalton Brooks
Represented By: Georgia SP Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?