Donald Broadnax v. Commissioner, Alabama DOC
Petitioner / Appellant: DONALD BROADNAX
Respondent / Appellee: COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 20-12600
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 7, 2021 Summary Broadnax v. Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Donald Broadnax, an Alabama prisoner sentenced to death following convictions of four counts of capital murder, seeks a certificate of appealability (COA) to appeal the denial of his 28 U.S.C. 2254 habeas corpus petition. Pursuant to Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484, 120 S. Ct. 1595, 160304 (2000), a COA is GRANTED on the following issues only: whether trial counsel rendered ineffective assistance by failing to investigate and present evidence of Mr. Broadnaxs alibi during the guilt phase of trial; whether the state habeas court violated Mr. Broadnaxs due process rights when it refused to allow Dr. Ken Benedict to testify about certain topics at the postconviction evidentiary hearing; and whether the state prosecutors comments were so prejudicial as to improperly shift the burden of proof from the State to Mr. Broadnax. [ # 9148421-2 ] BBM [Entered: 08/26/2020 03:36 PM]
August 26, 2020 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Donald Broadnax. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/05/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:02 PM]
August 11, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard Dearman Anderson for Appellee Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12600] (ECF: Richard Anderson) [Entered: 08/11/2020 04:38 PM]
July 29, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John Anthony Palombi for Appellant Donald Broadnax. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12600] (ECF: John Palombi) [Entered: 07/29/2020 03:31 PM]
July 28, 2020 MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Donald Broadnax. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9148421-1] [20-12600] (ECF: John Palombi) [Entered: 07/28/2020 03:26 PM]
July 28, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney John Anthony Palombi for Appellant Donald Broadnax. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-12600] (ECF: John Palombi) [Entered: 07/28/2020 03:29 PM]
July 27, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Dearman Anderson for Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. [20-12600] (ECF: Richard Anderson) [Entered: 07/27/2020 11:15 AM]
July 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY - ACTION REQUIRED by John Anthony Palombi for Donald Broadnax. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/23/2020 03:52 PM]
July 8, 2020 DEATH PENALTY APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Attorney John Anthony Palombi for Appellant Donald Broadnax on 07/08/2020. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:21 PM]
July 8, 2020 USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Donald Broadnax was filed on 07/08/2020. Docket Entry 24. [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:30 PM]
July 8, 2020 USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Donald Broadnax was filed on 06/19/2013. Docket Entry 4. [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:33 PM]
July 8, 2020 USDC Order Granting appointment of counsel as to Appellant Donald Broadnax was filed on 06/19/2013. Docket Entry 4. .John Palombi, an attorney employed by the Federal Defenders Program, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this action. [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Donald Broadnax v. Commissioner, Alabama DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DONALD BROADNAX
Represented By: John Anthony Palombi
Represented By: Leslie S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Richard Dearman Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?