Melvin Robertson v. Raphael Warnock, et al
Defendant / Appellee: RAPHAEL G. WARNOCK, KEITH E. GAMMAGE, individual capacity, office capacity, Fulton County Solicitor General of State of Georgia, CHARLES A. PANNELL, JR., individual capacity, for the Northern District of Georgia Atlanta Division, KASIM REED, individual capacity, office capacity, former Atlanta, Georgia Mayor and PAUL L. HOWARD, JR., individual capacity, office capacity, Fulton County District Attorney
Plaintiff / Appellant: MELVIN ROBERTSON
Case Number: 20-13115
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 USDC FRAP 4 Order as to Appellant Melvin Robertson was filed on 10/06/2020. Docket Entry 32. [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:08 PM]
October 2, 2020 Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 motion pending in district court as to Appellant Melvin Robertson DE #: 25 [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:23 PM]
September 21, 2020 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Melvin Robertson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9195993-1] [Entered: 09/24/2020 09:10 AM]
September 17, 2020 Public Communication: Letter from Pro Se Appellant change of number [Entered: 09/17/2020 02:31 PM]
September 11, 2020 Supplemental Motion for appointment of counsel [ # 9182941-2 ] filed by Appellant Melvin Robertson. [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:15 PM]
September 9, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Melvin Robertson. [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:11 PM]
September 4, 2020 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Melvin Robertson. [9182941-1] [Entered: 09/09/2020 11:20 AM]
August 19, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Melvin Robertson on 08/18/2020. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/28/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/02/2020 as to Appellant Melvin Robertson [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Melvin Robertson v. Raphael Warnock, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAPHAEL G. WARNOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEITH E. GAMMAGE, individual capacity, office capacity, Fulton County Solicitor General of State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES A. PANNELL, JR., individual capacity, for the Northern District of Georgia Atlanta Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KASIM REED, individual capacity, office capacity, former Atlanta, Georgia Mayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL L. HOWARD, JR., individual capacity, office capacity, Fulton County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELVIN ROBERTSON
Represented By: Melvin Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?