Antonio Battle v. Candice Taylor, et al
Defendant / Appellee: D. MAYS, Mr. Officer, CANDICE TAYLOR, Nurse, KING, SMITH and WARDEN
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTONIO DENTRAY BATTLE
Case Number: 20-13122
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Antonio Dentray Battle. [Entered: 10/08/2020 01:30 PM]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension of time to file motion for leave to proceed from obligation to pay filed by Appellant Antonio Dentray Battle is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9192083-2 ] to 10/12/2020. [Entered: 09/25/2020 01:57 PM]
September 23, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Deteri Mayes, Brenda King, Tracey Smith and Edward Ellington. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13122] (ECF: J. Bledsoe) [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:19 PM]
September 23, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Deteri Mayes, Brenda King, Tracey Smith and Edward Ellington [20-13122] (ECF: J. Bledsoe) [Entered: 09/23/2020 05:01 PM]
September 21, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Philip Guy Piggott for Appellee Candice Taylor. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13122] (ECF: Philip Piggott) [Entered: 09/21/2020 10:41 AM]
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Steven Marshall for Smith, Warden, King, Candice Taylor and D. Mays and Philip Guy Piggott for Candice Taylor. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 09/18/2020 05:02 PM]
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Antonio Dentray Battle. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 09/18/2020 04:54 PM]
September 8, 2020 MOTION for extension of time of fourteen (14) days, to file a motion for leave to proceed, consent form filed by Appellant Antonio Dentray Battle. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9192083-1] [Entered: 09/18/2020 05:17 PM]
August 27, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Antonio Dentray Battle. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:20 PM]
August 25, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Philip Guy Piggott for Candice Taylor. [20-13122] (ECF: Philip Piggott) [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:39 AM]
August 19, 2020 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Antonio Dentray Battle on 08/14/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 08/21/2020 01:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Antonio Battle v. Candice Taylor, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. MAYS, Mr. Officer
Represented By: J. Matt Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CANDICE TAYLOR, Nurse
Represented By: Philip Guy Piggott
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KING
Represented By: J. Matt Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SMITH
Represented By: J. Matt Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN
Represented By: J. Matt Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIO DENTRAY BATTLE
Represented By: Staton CF Warden
Represented By: Antonio Dentray Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?