Michelle Jacobs-Porter, et al v. Robert M Gardiner, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: CARLOS PORTER and MICHELLE JACOBS-PORTER
Defendant / Appellant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION and ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION
Defendant / Appellee: ROBERT M GARDINER
Case Number: 20-13398
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, Court Reporter: Leah Sharp Turner, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 09/02/2020. [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:57 AM]
September 14, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Timothy Dylan Reeves, I for Appellants FNM, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. Transcript(s) ordered. [20-13398] (ECF: Timothy Reeves) [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:34 PM]
September 9, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants RoundPoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, Federal National Mortgage Association, and Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. on 09/09/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/23/2020 as to Appellant Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/07/2020 as to Appellee Robert M Gardiner and Appellees Michelle Jacobs-Porter and Carlos Porter.--[Edited 09/14/2020 by CSG to add aple cip for Porters] [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michelle Jacobs-Porter, et al v. Robert M Gardiner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLOS PORTER
Represented By: Matthew Hornsby
Represented By: Thomas J. Skinner IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHELLE JACOBS-PORTER
Represented By: Matthew Hornsby
Represented By: Thomas J. Skinner IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Reeves I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Reeves I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Reeves I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT M GARDINER
Represented By: Kenneth James Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?