Christopher Hunt, Sr. v. Nationstar Mortgage, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER M. HUNT, SR.
Defendant / Appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, JAY BRAY, CEO Nationstar and ALBERTELLI LAW
Case Number: 20-13439
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. was filed on 10/27/2020. Docket Entry 69. [Entered: 11/02/2020 08:39 AM]
October 23, 2020 USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. was filed on 10/16/2020. Docket Entry 66. [Entered: 10/23/2020 08:13 AM]
October 22, 2020 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party Christopher M. Hunt, Sr.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13439] (ECF: Christopher Hunt) [Entered: 10/22/2020 01:55 PM]
October 15, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher Anulewicz for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [20-13439] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 10/15/2020 10:37 AM]
October 15, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Nicholas Silloway for Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [20-13439] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 10/15/2020 11:33 AM]
October 15, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Attorney Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Appellees Nationstar Mortgage, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Jay Bray have/has been conditionally filed. Document(s) may be clerically stricken and treated as though they were never filed if appearance of counsel has not been received within 14 days. [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:16 AM]
October 15, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Appellees Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13439] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 10/15/2020 06:31 AM]
October 14, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Nationstar Mortgage, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Jay Bray. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 10/14/2020 09:28 AM]
September 28, 2020 MOTION to consolidate appeals 20-13439 AND 20-12310 AND (TBD # forthcoming under Motions to Reconsider hence Motion for Stay filed by Christopher M. Hunt, Sr.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9199241-1] [20-13439] (ECF: Christopher Hunt) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:29 PM]
September 28, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr.. [Entered: 10/14/2020 09:27 AM]
September 25, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Christopher M. Hunt, Sr.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 09/25/2020 04:25 PM]
September 17, 2020 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. was filed on 08/10/2020. Docket Entry. [Entered: 09/17/2020 09:21 AM]
September 9, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. on 09/08/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/23/2020 as to Appellant Christopher M. Hunt Sr.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/07/2020 as to Appellees Albertelli Law and Nationstar Mortgage [Entered: 09/17/2020 09:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Christopher Hunt, Sr. v. Nationstar Mortgage, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER M. HUNT, SR.
Represented By: Christopher M. Hunt Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Brooke Gram
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Brooke Gram
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAY BRAY, CEO Nationstar
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Brooke Gram
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALBERTELLI LAW
Represented By: Cory Patrick Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?