Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Alex Azar, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CATALYST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, NORMAN SHARPLESS, Acting Commissioner of Food and Drugs, JACOBUS PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC. and ALEX AZAR, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 20-13922
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 The appellee is directed to file a response to Appellant's motion to expedite by Thursday, October 29, 2020. [Entered: 10/23/2020 05:05 PM]
October 23, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Philip Perry for Appellant Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13922] (ECF: Philip Perry) [Entered: 10/23/2020 02:02 PM]
October 23, 2020 MOTION to expedite filed by Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9219940-1] [20-13922] (ECF: Philip Perry) [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:20 AM]
October 22, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cherish A. Drain for Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [20-13922] (ECF: Cherish Drain) [Entered: 10/22/2020 05:07 PM]
October 22, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ryan Baasch for Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. [20-13922] (ECF: Ryan Baasch) [Entered: 10/22/2020 05:02 PM]
October 22, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew Prins for Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. [20-13922] (ECF: Andrew Prins) [Entered: 10/22/2020 04:59 PM]
October 22, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Philip Perry for Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. [20-13922] (ECF: Philip Perry) [Entered: 10/22/2020 04:56 PM]
October 22, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 10/19/2020 as to Appellant Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. [Entered: 10/22/2020 03:01 PM]
October 20, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 10/19/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/30/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/03/2020 as to Appellant Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/17/2020 as to Appellee Alex Azar [Entered: 10/22/2020 02:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Catalyst Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Alex Azar, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CATALYST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Philip Perry
Represented By: Monica C. Groat
Represented By: Andrew Prins
Represented By: Michael Constantine Marsh
Represented By: John R. Manthei
Represented By: Ryan Baasch
Represented By: Ryan Alan Roman
Represented By: Cherish Alise Drain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Ann F. Entwistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Ann F. Entwistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORMAN SHARPLESS, Acting Commissioner of Food and Drugs
Represented By: Ann F. Entwistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACOBUS PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Gabriel Krimm
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Represented By: Jarred Lee Reiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX AZAR, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Ann F. Entwistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?