Randall Callahan, et al v. United Network for Organ
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, a body politic and corporate and an independent instrumentality of the State of Kansas, RANDALL CALLAHAN, UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, PIEDMONT HEALTHCARE, THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, on behalf of its academic medical center, Michigan Medicine, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH, THE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, HENRY FORD HEALTH SYSTEM, MICHAEL WINGATE, KATRYNA GRISSON, UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY, THE RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, on behalf of its Medical Center, VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, CANDICE SEAMAN, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE UNIVERSITY and EMORY UNIVERSITY, d.b.a. Emory University Hospital
Defendant / Appellant: UNITED NETWORK FOR ORGAN SHARING
Not Classified By Court: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Case Number: 20-13932
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly Sheridan for United Network for Organ Sharing [20-13932] (ECF: Jay Blumenkopf) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:45 PM]
December 18, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sara Anderson Frey for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Sara Frey) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:31 PM]
December 18, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jay S. Blumenkopf for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Jay Blumenkopf) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:25 PM]
December 1, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 12/01/2020 07:27 PM]
December 1, 2020 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Katie Townsend for Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. [9249723-1] [20-13932] (ECF: KatieLynn Townsend) [Entered: 12/01/2020 05:32 PM]
December 1, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katie Townsend for Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press [20-13932] (ECF: KatieLynn Townsend) [Entered: 12/01/2020 05:16 PM]
December 1, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate [20-13932] (ECF: Peter Canfield) [Entered: 12/01/2020 04:43 PM]
November 17, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Courtney A. Carrell for Appellees Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13932] (ECF: Courtney Carrell) [Entered: 11/17/2020 12:45 PM]
November 17, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Courtney A. Carrell for Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [20-13932] (ECF: Courtney Carrell) [Entered: 11/17/2020 12:41 PM]
November 17, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter Canfield for Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [20-13932] (ECF: Peter Canfield) [Entered: 11/17/2020 12:35 PM]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9238209-2 ] Appellant's brief is now due on 12/21/2020.; ORDER: Motion for extension to file appendix filed by Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9238209-3 ] Appellant's Appendix is now due on 12/28/2020. [Entered: 11/17/2020 11:33 AM]
November 17, 2020 Amended Motion [ # 9238209-2 ], Motion [ # 9238209-3 ] filed by Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 11/17/2020 11:08 AM]
November 17, 2020 Notice of deficiency - Motion filed by Linda T. Coberly for United Network for Organ Sharing. Document does not contain a Certificate of Compliance, see FRAP 32(g)(1) Counsel must immediately file a corrected motion using the "Amend, Correct or Supplement Motion" event. [Entered: 11/17/2020 09:27 AM]
November 17, 2020 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to United Network for Organ Sharing. [Entered: 11/17/2020 09:20 AM]
November 16, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 12/21/2020, for extension of time to file appendix to 12/28/2020 filed by United Network for Organ Sharing. Motion is Unopposed. [9238209-1] [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:10 PM]
November 3, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Linda T. Coberly for Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:59 PM]
November 3, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Linda T. Coberly for Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:54 PM]
November 3, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Linda T. Coberly for Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:51 PM]
November 3, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melanie L. Lee for United Network for Organ Sharing [20-13932] (ECF: Melanie Lee) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:47 PM]
November 3, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren Gailey for United Network for Organ Sharing [20-13932] (ECF: Lauren Gailey) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:44 PM]
November 3, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sean H. Suber for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Sean Suber) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:41 PM]
November 3, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas G. Weber for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Thomas Weber) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:38 PM]
November 3, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel D. Rubinstein for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Daniel Rubinstein) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:35 PM]
November 3, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda T. Coberly for United Network for Organ Sharing. [20-13932] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:24 PM]
October 28, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 10/20/2020 as to Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:20 PM]
October 20, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing on 10/20/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/30/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/03/2020 as to Appellant United Network for Organ Sharing. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/17/2020 as to Appellee Randall Callahan [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Randall Callahan, et al v. United Network for Organ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, a body politic and corporate and an independent instrumentality of the State of Kansas
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RANDALL CALLAHAN
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNIVERSITY OF IOWA
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PIEDMONT HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, on behalf of its academic medical center, Michigan Medicine
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HENRY FORD HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL WINGATE
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KATRYNA GRISSON
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, on behalf of its Medical Center
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CANDICE SEAMAN
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMORY UNIVERSITY, d.b.a. Emory University Hospital
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED NETWORK FOR ORGAN SHARING
Represented By: Sean H. Suber
Represented By: Jay S. Blumenkopf
Represented By: Linda T. Coberly
Represented By: Thomas G. Weber
Represented By: Sara Anderson Frey
Represented By: Kimberly Council Sheridan
Represented By: Daniel D. Rubinstein
Represented By: Melanie Laiyee Lee
Represented By: Lauren Gailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?