USA v. James Williams
Defendant / Appellant: JAMES CLIFFORD WILLIAMS
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-14277
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Justin Davids for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14277] (ECF: Justin Davids) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:39 AM]
November 18, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Justin G. Davids for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia for USA. [20-14277] (ECF: Justin Davids) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:33 PM]
November 18, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 11/10/2020 as to Appellant James Clifford Williams. [Entered: 11/18/2020 02:04 PM]
November 13, 2020 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant James Clifford Williams on 11/10/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Appellant brief due 40 days from 11/13/2020. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 11/18/2020 02:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. James Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES CLIFFORD WILLIAMS
Represented By: Cameron Crandell Kuhlman
Represented By: Dwight T. Feemster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Justin Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?