Toree Jones v. Governor of Alabama, et al
Defendant / Appellee: RED EAGLE HONOR FARM WARDEN, ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, GOVERNOR OF ALABAMA and COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Plaintiff / Appellant: TOREE JONES
Case Number: 20-14287
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 MOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Appellant Toree Jones. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9275253-1] [Entered: 01/06/2021 07:07 AM]
December 11, 2020 NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN This case is closed. A motion to reinstate has not been received. Notice of receipt: Motion for IFP in the District Court, Transcript Order Form and Certificate of Interested Persons as to Appellant Toree Jones. [Entered: 12/18/2020 11:18 AM]
December 9, 2020 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Toree Jones failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 12/09/2020 04:40 PM]
December 4, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Toree Jones. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/04/2020 07:59 AM]
November 13, 2020 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Toree Jones on 11/13/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 11/18/2020 06:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Toree Jones v. Governor of Alabama, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RED EAGLE HONOR FARM WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOVERNOR OF ALABAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOREE JONES
Represented By: Red Eagle Honor Farm Warden
Represented By: Toree Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?