USF Federal Credit Union v. Gateway Radiology Consultants
Petitioner: USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Respondent: GATEWAY RADIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, P.A.
Case Number: 20-90015
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas G. Zeichman for Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.. [20-90015] (ECF: Thomas Zeichman) [Entered: 07/31/2020 09:26 AM]
July 28, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Maury L. Udell for Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.. [20-90015] (ECF: Maury Udell) [Entered: 07/28/2020 09:46 AM]
July 24, 2020 MISCELLANEOUS CASE DOCKETED. Petition for permission to appeal direct from bankruptcy court pursuant to 28 USC 158(d) filed by Petitioner USF Federal Credit Union. Served 07/28/2020 [Entered: 07/28/2020 09:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USF Federal Credit Union v. Gateway Radiology Consultants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Represented By: Adam M. Gilbert
Represented By: Megan Wilson Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GATEWAY RADIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, P.A.
Represented By: Thomas G. Zeichman
Represented By: Maury L. Udell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?