Christopher Hunt, Sr. v. Nationstar Mortgage, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER M. HUNT, SR.
Defendant / Appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, JAY BRAY, CEO Nationstar and ALBERTELLI LAW
Case Number: 21-10262
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage [21-10262] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:06 PM]
February 8, 2021 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. [21-10262] (ECF: Christopher Hunt) [Entered: 02/08/2021 10:00 PM]
February 1, 2021 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Christopher M. Hunt, Sr.. [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:35 PM]
January 29, 2021 Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Co.'s Notice That Appellant's Certificate of Interested Parties is Incomplete filed by Attorney Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Appellees Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10262] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 01/29/2021 03:14 PM]
January 29, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mrs. Brooke Gram for Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10262] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 01/29/2021 02:58 PM]
January 29, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10262] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 01/29/2021 02:55 PM]
January 29, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Nicholas Silloway for Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10262] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 01/29/2021 02:57 PM]
January 22, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. on 01/19/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/05/2021 as to Appellant Christopher M. Hunt Sr.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/19/2021 as to Appellees Albertelli Law and Nationstar Mortgage [Entered: 01/26/2021 09:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Christopher Hunt, Sr. v. Nationstar Mortgage, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER M. HUNT, SR.
Represented By: Christopher M. Hunt Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Brooke Gram
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Brooke Gram
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAY BRAY, CEO Nationstar
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Brooke Gram
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALBERTELLI LAW
Represented By: Cory Patrick Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?