Richard Sprague v. Sanofi S.A., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD SPRAGUE, individually and as representative of the estate of Brenda Sprague and MARILYN WILLIAMS
Defendant / Appellee: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI S.A., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, SA., APOTEX, CORP., DR.REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD, WALGREEN CO., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC and DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Case Number: 21-10306
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Richard Sprague's (only) motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 03/10/2021 04:07 PM]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Richard Sprague is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9323664-2 ] [Entered: 03/10/2021 04:01 PM]
March 5, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Terry M. Henry for Defendant-Appellee Apotex Corp. [21-10306] (ECF: Terry Henry) [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:24 PM]
March 3, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Noah Heinz for Appellant Marilyn Williams [21-10306] (ECF: Noah Heinz) [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:48 PM]
March 3, 2021 17-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. Updated Awaiting Response to Motion. Due on 03/29/2021 as to Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:17 PM]
March 3, 2021 20-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. Appellants brief due on 03/29/2021 as to Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:12 PM]
March 3, 2021 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Richard Sprague. Motion is Unopposed. [9323664-1] [21-10306] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 03/03/2021 03:41 PM]
March 2, 2021 MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9322751-1] [21-10306] (ECF: Paul Mezzina) [Entered: 03/02/2021 09:49 PM]
March 2, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah E. Johnston for Walgreen Co. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. [21-10306] (ECF: Sarah Johnston) [Entered: 03/02/2021 05:09 PM]
February 25, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brian Casey for Walgreen Co. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10306] (ECF: Brian Casey) [Entered: 02/25/2021 10:42 PM]
February 25, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Casey for Walgreen Co. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. [21-10306] (ECF: Brian Casey) [Entered: 02/25/2021 10:34 PM]
February 25, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Paul Mezzina for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, and Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10306] (ECF: Paul Mezzina) [Entered: 02/25/2021 08:11 PM]
February 25, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Limited; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories SA Attorney Linda E. Maichl for Appellees Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, SA. and RDY. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10306] (ECF: Linda Maichl) [Entered: 02/25/2021 06:33 PM]
February 25, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Apotex Corp. Attorney Melissa Fundora Murphy for Appellee Apotex, Corp.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10306] (ECF: Melissa Murphy) [Entered: 02/25/2021 06:17 PM]
February 25, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jay P. Lefkowitz for Appellee GlaxoSmithKline LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10306] (ECF: Jay Lefkowitz) [Entered: 02/25/2021 05:54 PM]
February 25, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ilana Hope Eisenstein for Appellees Sanofi US Services, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10306] (ECF: Ilana Eisenstein) [Entered: 02/25/2021 05:27 PM]
February 19, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Madison H. Kitchens for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, and Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation [21-10306] (ECF: Madison Kitchens) [Entered: 02/19/2021 10:17 PM]
February 19, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul Alessio Mezzina for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, and Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation [21-10306] (ECF: Paul Mezzina) [Entered: 02/19/2021 09:57 PM]
February 18, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jay P. Lefkowitz for GlaxoSmithKline LLC [21-10306] (ECF: Jay Lefkowitz) [Entered: 02/18/2021 04:59 PM]
February 18, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John R. Ipsaro for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Limited, and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, SA [21-10306] (ECF: John Ipsaro) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:22 AM]
February 18, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda E. Maichl for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Limited, and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, SA [21-10306] (ECF: Linda Maichl) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:15 AM]
February 17, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melissa F. Murphy, Esquire of Blank Rome LLP on behalf of Defendant-Appellee Apotex Corp. [21-10306] (ECF: Melissa Murphy) [Entered: 02/17/2021 04:41 PM]
February 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rachel Horton for Sanofi US Services, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. [21-10306] (ECF: Rachel Horton) [Entered: 02/16/2021 06:23 PM]
February 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ilana Hope Eisenstein for Sanofi US Services, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. [21-10306] (ECF: Ilana Eisenstein) [Entered: 02/16/2021 06:17 PM]
February 12, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. [21-10306] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:43 PM]
February 12, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10306] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/12/2021 07:57 PM]
February 12, 2021 Notice of deficient Civil Appeal Statement and CIP filed by Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. Counsel has filed 2 Civil Appeal Statements and 2 CIPs. The appellants are represented by the same attorney; therefore, the CAS and CIP must be filed as one document. Counsel must file a corrected CAS and a corrected CIP within 3 days of this notice. [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:21 AM]
February 12, 2021 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/09/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:56 AM]
February 11, 2021 **ERROR/Attorney must file 1 CIP for both Appellants**Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10306] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/11/2021 11:22 PM]
February 11, 2021 **ERROR/Attorney must file 1 CIP for both Appellants**Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10306]--[Edited 02/12/2021 by TLR] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/11/2021 11:21 PM]
February 11, 2021 **ERROR/Attorney must file 1 CAS for both Appellants**Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. [21-10306]--[Edited 02/12/2021 by TLR] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/11/2021 07:32 PM]
February 11, 2021 **ERROR/Attorney must file 1 CAS for both Appellants**Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. [21-10306]--[Edited 02/12/2021 by TLR]-- (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/11/2021 07:31 PM]
February 10, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 02/10/2021 02:12 PM]
February 10, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 02/10/2021 02:10 PM]
February 10, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-10306] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:11 PM]
February 10, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellants Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-10306] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:10 PM]
February 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ashley Keller for Marilyn Williams Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. [21-10306] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/10/2021 10:01 AM]
February 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ashley Keller for Richard Sprague Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Richard Sprague and Marilyn Williams. [21-10306] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/10/2021 09:58 AM]
February 2, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 01/27/2021 as to Appellant Marilyn Williams. [Entered: 02/02/2021 04:39 PM]
February 1, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 01/27/2021 as to Appellant Richard Sprague. [Entered: 02/01/2021 04:24 PM]
January 28, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Marilyn Williams on 01/27/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/11/2021 as to Appellant Marilyn Williams [Entered: 02/02/2021 04:33 PM]
January 28, 2021 MULTI-CROSS APPEAL DOCKETED. [Entered: 02/02/2021 04:12 PM]
January 28, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Richard Sprague on 01/27/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/11/2021 as to Appellant Richard Sprague. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/25/2021 as to Appellee Sanofi S.A. [Entered: 02/01/2021 04:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Richard Sprague v. Sanofi S.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD SPRAGUE, individually and as representative of the estate of Brenda Sprague
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARILYN WILLIAMS
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Caroline G. McGlamry
Represented By: Neal Kirkland Pope
Represented By: Courtney Lynn Mohammadi
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Noah Heinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Julia Zousmer
Represented By: Garth Yearick
Represented By: Richard J. Sapp
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Eric Francis Gladbach
Represented By: Justin D. Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen J. Krigbaum
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Madison Kitchens
Represented By: Gregory A. Ruehlmann
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: Veronica Louise De Zayas
Represented By: Elizabeth Francesca Lindquist
Represented By: James G. Powers
Represented By: Mark Alan Sentenac
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Represented By: Amy L. O'Neill
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Represented By: Jordan Scott Joachim
Represented By: Stephen B. Devereaux
Represented By: April N. Hook
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Represented By: Robert B. Friedman
Represented By: James Robert Sheppard III
Represented By: Oliver Peter Thoma
Represented By: Sarah A. Westby
Represented By: Cheryl A. Sabnis
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Represented By: Matthew J. Blaschke
Represented By: Paul Alessio Mezzina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: Jessica M. Hernandez
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Matthew A. Holian
Represented By: Jeff Tsai
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Christopher M. Young
Represented By: Nancy Shane Rappaport
Represented By: Anthony D. Boccanfuso
Represented By: Rachel Horton
Represented By: Angelique Antonia Ciliberti
Represented By: Leeanne Sara Mancari
Represented By: Paige H. Sharpe
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Represented By: Ilana Hope Eisenstein
Represented By: Loren H. Brown
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Represented By: Peter H. Kyle
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Evans
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Represented By: Ruth Dapper
Represented By: Daniel S. Pariser
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANOFI S.A.
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANOFI US SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Jessica M. Hernandez
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Matthew A. Holian
Represented By: Jeff Tsai
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Christopher M. Young
Represented By: Nancy Shane Rappaport
Represented By: Anthony D. Boccanfuso
Represented By: Rachel Horton
Represented By: Angelique Antonia Ciliberti
Represented By: Leeanne Sara Mancari
Represented By: Paige H. Sharpe
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Represented By: Ilana Hope Eisenstein
Represented By: Loren H. Brown
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Represented By: Peter H. Kyle
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Evans
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Represented By: Ruth Dapper
Represented By: Daniel S. Pariser
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, SA.
Represented By: Linda E. Maichl
Represented By: John R. Ipsaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APOTEX, CORP.
Represented By: Melissa Fundora Murphy
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR.REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD
Represented By: Linda E. Maichl
Represented By: John R. Ipsaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALGREEN CO.
Represented By: Brian E. Casey
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC.
Represented By: Brian E. Casey
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Linda E. Maichl
Represented By: John R. Ipsaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?