Office Depot, Inc. v. Elementum, Ltd.
Defendant / Appellee: ELEMENTUM, LTD., a Foreign Limited Partnership agent of Elementum SCM (Cayman), Ltd
Plaintiff / Appellant: OFFICE DEPOT, INC., a Delaware Corporation
Case Number: 21-10332
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 MOTION MOOT: Motion is MOOT [ # 9322584-2 ] FRAP 4, motion pending in district court 03/03/2021. (Joint) Motion to Suspend or Abate Appellate Proceedings filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee ODP and Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd.. [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:15 PM]
March 3, 2021 Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 motion pending in district court as to Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd. DE #: 267, Motion to Alter Judgment [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:04 PM]
March 2, 2021 MOTION To Suspend or Abate Appellate Proceedings filed by ODP. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [9322584-1] [21-10332] (ECF: Christopher Pace) [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:17 PM]
March 2, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Marie A. Borland for Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [21-10332] (ECF: Marie Borland) [Entered: 03/02/2021 11:31 AM]
March 2, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Marie A. Borland for Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd.. [21-10332] (ECF: Marie Borland) [Entered: 03/02/2021 11:29 AM]
February 24, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Marie A. Borland for Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10332] (ECF: Marie Borland) [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:39 AM]
February 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott W. Taylor for Elementum, Ltd.. [21-10332] (ECF: Marie Borland) [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:29 AM]
February 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicholas A. Roethlisberger for Elementum, Ltd.. [21-10332] (ECF: Marie Borland) [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:28 AM]
February 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ms. Kate E. Lazarus for Elementum, Ltd.. [21-10332] (ECF: Marie Borland) [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:25 AM]
February 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marie A. Borland for Elementum, Ltd.. [21-10332] (ECF: Marie Borland) [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:20 AM]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Scott W. Taylor is GRANTED by clerk. [9314346-2] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:22 AM]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Nicholas A. Roethlisberger is GRANTED by clerk. [9314298-2] [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:57 AM]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Ms. Kate E. Lazarus is GRANTED by clerk. [9314274-2] [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:51 AM]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Asim M. Bhansali is GRANTED by clerk. [9314207-2] [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:14 AM]
February 18, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Scott W. Taylor for Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd.. [9314346-1] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:21 AM]
February 18, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Nicholas A. Roethlisberger for Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd.. [9314298-1] [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:56 AM]
February 18, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Ms. Kate E. Lazarus for Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd.. [9314274-1] [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:45 AM]
February 18, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Asim M. Bhansali for Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd.. [9314207-1] [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:12 AM]
February 18, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [21-10332, 21-10435] [Entered: 02/18/2021 04:53 PM]
February 16, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Christopher Martin Lomax for Appellant-Cross Appellee ODP. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 02/18/2021 03:46 PM]
February 16, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Christopher Martin Lomax for Appellant-Cross Appellee ODP. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10332] (ECF: Christopher Lomax) [Entered: 02/16/2021 09:03 PM]
February 16, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Christopher R.J. Pace for Appellant-Cross Appellee ODP. [21-10332] (ECF: Christopher Pace) [Entered: 02/16/2021 07:51 PM]
February 16, 2021 Letter regarding inactive status and bar membership renewal issued to attorney Attorney Christina Therese Mastrucci Lehn for Appellant-Cross Appellee ODP. [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:25 AM]
February 16, 2021 Notifying court of pending Motion to Amend the Judgment filed by Attorney Marie A. Borland for Appellee Elementum, Ltd.. [21-10332] (ECF: Marie Borland) [Entered: 02/15/2021 01:31 PM]
February 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher R.J. Pace for ODP [21-10332] (ECF: Christopher Pace) [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:26 PM]
February 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brianna Paige Hathaway for ODP. [21-10332] (ECF: Brianna Hathaway) [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:24 PM]
February 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christina Therese Mastrucci Lehn for ODP. [21-10332] (ECF: Christina Mastrucci Lehn) [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:07 PM]
February 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher Martin Lomax for ODP. [21-10332] (ECF: Christopher Lomax) [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:05 PM]
February 11, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd. on 02/10/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/25/2021 as to Appellee-Cross Appellant Elementum, Ltd.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/11/2021 as to Appellant-Cross Appellee Office Depot, Inc. [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:03 AM]
February 9, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marie A. Borland for Elementum, Ltd. [21-10332] (ECF: Marie Borland) [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:12 PM]
February 1, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant ODP on 01/29/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/16/2021 as to Appellant Office Depot, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/01/2021 as to Appellee Elementum, Ltd. [Entered: 02/02/2021 10:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Office Depot, Inc. v. Elementum, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELEMENTUM, LTD., a Foreign Limited Partnership agent of Elementum SCM (Cayman), Ltd
Represented By: Asim Bhansali
Represented By: Scott W. Taylor
Represented By: Kate E. Lazarus
Represented By: Nicholas A. Roethlisberger
Represented By: John C. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OFFICE DEPOT, INC., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Christina Therese Mastrucci Lehn
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Represented By: Brianna Paige Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?