Willie Smith, III v. Commissioner, Alabama DOC
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIE B. SMITH, III
Defendant / Appellee: COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 21-10348
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 10, 2021 Willie B. Smith, III v. Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Mandate issued as to Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. [Entered: 03/11/2021 02:31 PM]
February 10, 2021 Judgment entered as to Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. [Entered: 02/10/2021 07:21 PM]
February 10, 2021 Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. Decision: Reversed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions . [Entered: 02/10/2021 07:17 PM]
February 9, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. [Entered: 02/12/2021 02:06 PM]
February 9, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. [Entered: 02/11/2021 06:50 PM]
February 9, 2021 Reply Brief filed by Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. [21-10348] (ECF: Spencer Hahn) [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:28 AM]
February 8, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allison P. Gardner for Willie B. Smith [21-10348] (ECF: Allison Gardner) [Entered: 02/08/2021 04:43 PM]
February 8, 2021 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. [21-10348] (ECF: Lauren Simpson) [Entered: 02/08/2021 10:54 AM]
February 5, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kirby Mayo for Willie B. Smith, III [21-10348] (ECF: Kirby Mayo) [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:35 AM]
February 5, 2021 Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. [21-10348] (ECF: Spencer Hahn) [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:14 PM]
February 5, 2021 Appellant's brief filed by Willie B. Smith, III. [21-10348] (ECF: Spencer Hahn) [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:58 AM]
February 5, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paige H. Sharpe for Willie B. Smith, III [21-10348] (ECF: Paige Sharpe) [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:39 AM]
February 5, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anand Agneshwar for Willie B. Smith, III Anand Agneshwar for Willie B. Smith, III. [21-10348] (ECF: Anand Agneshwar) [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:31 AM]
February 4, 2021 USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Willie B. Smith, III was filed on 02/04/2021. Docket Entry 42. [Entered: 02/04/2021 01:32 PM]
February 4, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by A. Barrett Bowdre for Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections [21-10348] (ECF: Alexander Bowdre) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:12 AM]
February 4, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edmund G. LaCour Jr. - Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections [21-10348] (ECF: Edmund LaCour) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:09 AM]
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to expedite briefing filed by Appellant Willie B. Smith, III is GRANTED. [ # 9300230-2 ] Appellants Initial Brief shall be filed and served by 12:00 p.m. EST on February 5, 2021. Appellees Response Brief shall be filed and served by 12:00 p.m. EST on February 8, 2021. Appellants Reply Brief shall be filed and served by 12:00 p.m. EST on February 9, 2021. CRW (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 02/04/2021 08:45 AM]
February 3, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Spencer Hahn for Willie B. Smith III. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10348] (ECF: Spencer Hahn) [Entered: 02/03/2021 12:55 PM]
February 3, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant Willie B. Smith, III [ # 9300230-2 ] filed by Attorney Lauren Ashley Simpson for Appellee Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. [21-10348] (ECF: Lauren Simpson) [Entered: 02/03/2021 06:06 PM]
February 3, 2021 EMERGENCY MOTION to expedite briefing filed by Willie B. Smith, III. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9300230-1] [21-10348] (ECF: Spencer Hahn) [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:28 PM]
February 3, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lauren Ashley Simpson for Appellee Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10348] (ECF: Lauren Simpson) [Entered: 02/03/2021 02:53 PM]
February 3, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren Ashley Simpson for Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. [21-10348] (ECF: Lauren Simpson) [Entered: 02/03/2021 02:51 PM]
February 3, 2021 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT -TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Spencer Jay Hahn for Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 02/03/2021 02:12 PM]
February 3, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Spencer Jay Hahn for Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 02/03/2021 01:13 PM]
February 3, 2021 DEATH PENALTY APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Anand Agneshwar for Appellant Willie B. Smith, III, Spencer Jay Hahn for Appellant Willie B. Smith, III and John Anthony Palombi for Appellant Willie B. Smith, III on 02/02/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid.**Execution scheduled for February 11, 2021** [Entered: 02/03/2021 09:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Willie Smith, III v. Commissioner, Alabama DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIE B. SMITH, III
Represented By: John Anthony Palombi
Represented By: Spencer Jay Hahn
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Represented By: Kirby Mayo
Represented By: Allison Gardner
Represented By: Paige H. Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Simpson
Represented By: Alexander Barrett Bowdre
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?