Willie B. Smith, III v. Commissioner, Alabama DOC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIE B. SMITH, III
Defendant / Appellee: HOLMAN CF WARDEN and COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 21-10413
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to dismiss appeal as moot filed by Appellant Willie B. Smith, III is GRANTED. [ # 9339706-2 ] CRW, BBM and AJ (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 03/26/2021 02:54 PM]
March 22, 2021 MOTION to dismiss appeal as moot filed by Willie B. Smith, III. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9339706-1] [21-10413] (ECF: John Palombi) [Entered: 03/22/2021 07:44 PM]
February 12, 2021 SUPREME COURT ORDER - The application to vacate the injunction(#20A128) presented to JUSTICE THOMAS and by him referred to the Court is Denied. [Entered: 02/12/2021 12:30 PM]
February 12, 2021 SUPREME COURT ORDER - The application to vacate the stay of execution (#20A129) entered by the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit on February 10, 2021, presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court, is granted. [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:49 AM]
February 10, 2021 Corrected Motion [ # 9305844-2 ] filed by Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. [21-10413] (ECF: Spencer Hahn) [Entered: 02/10/2021 01:09 PM]
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Stay of Executionl filed by Appellant Willie B. Smith, III is GRANTED. The execution is stayed until Tuesday, February 16, 2021 at 5:00 p.m. EST to allow the court time to review the merits of the claim. [ # 9305844-2 ] CRW, BBM and AJ (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 02/10/2021 08:11 PM]
February 10, 2021 Reply to response filed by Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. [21-10413] (ECF: Spencer Hahn) [Entered: 02/10/2021 08:02 PM]
February 10, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion to stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Willie B. Smith, III [ # 9305844-2 ] filed by Attorney Lauren Ashley Simpson for Appellees Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections and Holman CF Warden. [21-10413] (ECF: Lauren Simpson) [Entered: 02/10/2021 04:41 PM]
February 10, 2021 DEATH PENALTY APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Allyson Dulac, Spencer Jay Hahn and John Anthony Palombi for Appellant Willie B. Smith, III on 02/09/2021. USDC motion pending: IFP Motion DE#51 filed on 02/09/2021. Fee Status: IFP Pending. [Entered: 02/10/2021 08:30 AM]
February 10, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Spencer Hahn for Willie B. Smith III Attorney Spencer Jay Hahn for Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10413] (ECF: Spencer Hahn) [Entered: 02/10/2021 08:40 AM]
February 10, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lauren Ashley Simpson for Appellees Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections and Holman CF Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10413] (ECF: Lauren Simpson) [Entered: 02/10/2021 09:55 AM]
February 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren Ashley Simpson for Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections and Holman CF Warden. [21-10413] (ECF: Lauren Simpson) [Entered: 02/10/2021 09:54 AM]
February 10, 2021 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Willie B. Smith, III. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/22/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/10/2021 09:42 AM]
February 10, 2021 USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Willie B. Smith, III was filed on 02/10/2021. Docket Entry 53. [Entered: 02/10/2021 09:32 AM]
February 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by A. Barrett Bowdre for Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. [21-10413] (ECF: Alexander Bowdre) [Entered: 02/10/2021 09:18 AM]
February 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edmund G. LaCour Jr. for Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. [21-10413] (ECF: Edmund LaCour) [Entered: 02/10/2021 09:16 AM]
February 10, 2021 EMERGENCY MOTION to stay pending appeal filed by Willie B. Smith, III. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9305844-1] [21-10413] (ECF: Spencer Hahn) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Willie B. Smith, III v. Commissioner, Alabama DOC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIE B. SMITH, III
Represented By: John Anthony Palombi
Represented By: Spencer Jay Hahn
Represented By: Allyson Dulac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOLMAN CF WARDEN
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Simpson
Represented By: Alexander Barrett Bowdre
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMISSIONER, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Simpson
Represented By: Alexander Barrett Bowdre
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?