Jeremy Wells v. Warden, et al
Defendant / Appellee: FLUKER, WARDEN and CLIFFORD BROWN, Unit Manager
Plaintiff / Appellant: JEREMY JOHN WELLS
Case Number: 21-10550
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Perry Cao (for Jeremy John Wells) [21-10550] (ECF: Perry Cao) [Entered: 04/15/2021 04:30 PM]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Jeremy John Wells is GRANTED. [ # 9327126-2 ] Appellants brief due on 06/04/2021. AJ (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 03/15/2021 03:41 PM]
March 8, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 06/04/2021 filed by Jeremy John Wells. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9327126-1] [21-10550] (ECF: Easha Anand) [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:26 PM]
March 4, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Easha Anand for Jeremy John Wells [21-10550] (ECF: Easha Anand) [Entered: 03/04/2021 10:15 AM]
March 3, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Devi M. Rao for Appellant Jeremy John Wells. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10550] (ECF: Devi Rao) [Entered: 03/03/2021 03:40 PM]
March 3, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Devi M. Rao for Appellant Jeremy John Wells. No hearings. [21-10550] (ECF: Devi Rao) [Entered: 03/03/2021 03:38 PM]
March 3, 2021 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Jeremy John Wells. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/05/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 03/03/2021 08:19 AM]
March 2, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Devi M. Rao for Jeremy John Wells. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/02/2021 05:59 PM]
February 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Devi M. Rao for Appellant Jeremy Wells Jeremy John Wells. [21-10550] (ECF: Devi Rao) [Entered: 02/26/2021 04:33 PM]
February 18, 2021 USDC Order determining appellant to be 3 strikes and is required to pay the full filing fee pursuant to 1915(g). Filed on 12/18/2020. Docket Entry 21. [Entered: 02/24/2021 07:44 AM]
February 18, 2021 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jeremy John Wells on 02/18/2021. Fee Status: Three Strikes.. [Entered: 02/24/2021 07:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jeremy Wells v. Warden, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLUKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLIFFORD BROWN, Unit Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEREMY JOHN WELLS
Represented By: Jeremy John Wells
Represented By: Easha Anand
Represented By: Devi M. Rao
Represented By: Perry Rihua Cao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?