USA v. George Poulo
Defendant / Appellant: GEORGE POULO
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 21-10667
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 6, 2023 USA v. George Poulo

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adeel Bashir for George Poulo [21-10667] (ECF: Adeel Bashir) [Entered: 03/03/2021 02:28 PM]
March 1, 2021 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant George Poulo on 02/26/2021. Fee Status: IFP Granted. [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. George Poulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GEORGE POULO
Represented By: James T. Skuthan
Represented By: Joshua Roy Lukman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?