Sandtoro Pearson v. Lee Arrendale State Prison, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WENDY ROYAL, MONICA HILL and JILL KENNY
Plaintiff / Appellant: SANDTORO E. PEARSON
Case Number: 21-10708
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Monica Hill, Jill Kenny and Wendy Royal. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9356108-1] [21-10708] (ECF: Jason Kang) [Entered: 04/09/2021 04:50 PM]
April 7, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jason H. Kang for Monica Hill, Wendy Royal and Jill Kenny. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:44 AM]
April 6, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jason H. Kang for Appellee. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10708] (ECF: Jason Kang) [Entered: 04/06/2021 05:37 PM]
April 6, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kang, Jason H. for Appellee [21-10708] (ECF: Jason Kang) [Entered: 04/06/2021 05:33 PM]
April 2, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Christopher Michael Carr and Ronald Joseph Stay for Monica Hill, Wendy Royal and Jill Kenny. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/02/2021 12:23 PM]
March 29, 2021 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Sandtoro E. Pearson. [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:24 PM]
March 29, 2021 Notice of receipt: Letter to court re conditions at facility as to Appellant Sandtoro E. Pearson. [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:22 PM]
March 23, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Sandtoro E. Pearson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/23/2021 08:53 AM]
March 3, 2021 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Sandtoro E. Pearson on 01/21/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. USDC motion Pending: Motion to Appoint Counsel on Appeal, DE# 110 01/21/2021. [Entered: 03/05/2021 03:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sandtoro Pearson v. Lee Arrendale State Prison, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WENDY ROYAL
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Stay
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Jason H. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONICA HILL
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Stay
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Jason H. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JILL KENNY
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Stay
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Jason H. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDTORO E. PEARSON
Represented By: Sandtoro E. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?