Shelia Varnedoe v. Postmaster General
Defendant / Appellee: POSTMASTER GENERAL, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHELIA K. VARNEDOE
Case Number: 21-11186
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Public Communication: The notice to appellant for deficient appendix is hereby rescinded. [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:45 PM]
June 3, 2021 Notice of deficient Appellant appendix filed by Party Shelia K. Varnedoe. Deficiencies: docket sheet, complaint, answer & order being appealed. [Entered: 06/03/2021 12:42 PM]
June 1, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Channell Veena Singh for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia for Postmaster General, U.S. Postal Service. [21-11186] (ECF: Channell Singh) [Entered: 06/01/2021 11:21 AM]
May 26, 2021 Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES - 1 copies] by Party Shelia K. Varnedoe. Service date: 05/21/2021 US mail - Appellant Varnedoe; email - Attorney for Appellees: Davids, Singh, U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia. [Entered: 06/03/2021 12:20 PM]
May 20, 2021 Appellant's brief filed by Shelia K. Varnedoe. Service date: 05/18/2021 [21-11186] Attorney for Appellee: Davids - email; Attorney for Appellee: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia - email. [Entered: 05/21/2021 04:39 PM]
April 26, 2021 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Shelia K. Varnedoe. [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:15 AM]
April 16, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Justin Davids for Appellee Postmaster General, U.S. Postal Service. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11186] (ECF: Justin Davids) [Entered: 04/16/2021 09:57 AM]
April 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Justin G. Davids for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia for Postmaster General, U.S. Postal Service. [21-11186] (ECF: Justin Davids) [Entered: 04/14/2021 11:40 AM]
April 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 04/12/2021 as to Appellant Shelia K. Varnedoe. [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:36 AM]
April 8, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Shelia K. Varnedoe on 04/08/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/18/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/22/2021 as to Appellant Shelia K. Varnedoe. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/06/2021 as to Appellee Postmaster General, U.S. Postal Service [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shelia Varnedoe v. Postmaster General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: POSTMASTER GENERAL, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Justin Davids
Represented By: Channell Veena Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHELIA K. VARNEDOE
Represented By: Shelia K. Varnedoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?