Juan Jimenez-Hernandez v. U.S. Attorney General
Petitioner: JUAN GABRIEL JIMENEZ-HERNANDEZ
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 21-11315
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Briefing Notice issued to Petitioner Juan Gabriel Jimenez-Hernandez. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/23/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/14/2021 03:20 PM]
May 14, 2021 BIA Record on Appeal Filed [21-11315] (ECF: DOJ Executive Office Of Immigration Review) [Entered: 05/14/2021 01:22 PM]
May 12, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Logan Robert Luquette for Petitioner Juan Gabriel Jimenez-Hernandez. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11315] (ECF: Logan Luquette) [Entered: 05/12/2021 11:24 AM]
May 12, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Logan Robert Luquette for Juan Gabriel Jimenez-Hernandez. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:18 AM]
April 29, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jessica D. Strokus for Respondent Attorney Jessica Danielle Strokus for Respondent U.S. Attorney General. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11315] (ECF: Jessica Strokus) [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:49 PM]
April 28, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Logan Robert Luquette for Petitioner [21-11315] (ECF: Logan Luquette) [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:55 PM]
April 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anthony C. Payne OIL for U.S. Attorney General. [21-11315] (ECF: Anthony Payne) [Entered: 04/27/2021 11:16 AM]
April 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jessica D. Strokus OIL for U.S. Attorney General. [21-11315] (ECF: Jessica Strokus) [Entered: 04/27/2021 11:13 AM]
April 22, 2021 AGENCY PETITION / APPLICATION DOCKETED. Filed by Petitioner Juan Gabriel Jimenez-Hernandez. Fee Status: Fee Paid. 04/22/2021. [Entered: 04/23/2021 10:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Juan Jimenez-Hernandez v. U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Jessica Danielle Strokus
Represented By: OIL
Represented By: Anthony Cardozo Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JUAN GABRIEL JIMENEZ-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Logan Robert Luquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?