American Marine Tech, Inc. v. M/Y Alchemist, et al
Defendant / Appellant: M/Y ALCHEMIST, a 1995 105 Mangusta recreational vessel, her boats, engines, generators, tackle, rigging, apparel, furniture, furnishings, equipment, contents and appurtenances, etc., in rem and WORLD GROUP YACHTING, INC., in personam
Plaintiff / Appellee: AMERICAN MARINE TECH, INC.
Case Number: 21-11336
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Alexander Philip Koffler for Appellee American Marine Tech, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11336] (ECF: Alexander Koffler) [Entered: 05/20/2021 02:54 PM]
May 19, 2021 Over the phone 28 day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Clay Michael Naughton for Appellants M/Y Alchemist and World Group Yachting, Inc.. Appellants' brief due on 06/29/2021, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. [Entered: 05/19/2021 12:10 PM]
May 17, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David J. Horr - American Marine Tech, Inc. [21-11336] (ECF: David Horr) [Entered: 05/17/2021 06:27 PM]
May 17, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephanie H. Wylie - American Marine Tech, Inc. [21-11336] (ECF: Stephanie Wylie) [Entered: 05/17/2021 06:25 PM]
May 13, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/13/2021 05:51 PM]
May 7, 2021 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants M/Y Alchemist and World Group Yachting, Inc.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/01/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/07/2021 09:11 AM]
May 6, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Clay Michael Naughton for Appellants M/Y Alchemist and World Group Yachting, Inc.. [21-11336] (ECF: Clay Naughton) [Entered: 05/06/2021 08:53 PM]
May 6, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Clay Michael Naughton for Appellants M/Y Alchemist and World Group Yachting, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11336] (ECF: Clay Naughton) [Entered: 05/06/2021 08:26 PM]
May 6, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Clay Michael Naughton for Appellants M/Y Alchemist and World Group Yachting, Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [21-11336] (ECF: Clay Naughton) [Entered: 05/06/2021 08:21 PM]
May 6, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Clay Michael Naughton for M/Y Alchemist and World Group Yachting, Inc.. [21-11336] (ECF: Clay Naughton) [Entered: 05/06/2021 08:17 PM]
April 30, 2021 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Christopher R. Fertig for American Marine Tech, Inc. is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 04/30/2021 07:32 AM]
April 29, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher R. Fertig for American Marine Tech, Inc.. [21-11336] (ECF: Christopher Fertig) [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:29 PM]
April 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexander Philip Koffler for American Marine Tech, Inc.. [21-11336] (ECF: Alexander Koffler) [Entered: 04/26/2021 05:14 PM]
April 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cullin A. O'Brien for American Marine Tech, Inc.. [21-11336] (ECF: Cullin O'Brien) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:30 PM]
April 23, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 04/15/2021 as to Appellant M/Y Alchemist. [Entered: 04/23/2021 11:54 AM]
April 22, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants M/Y Alchemist and World Group Yachting, Inc. on 04/15/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/06/2021 as to Appellant M/Y Alchemist. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/20/2021 as to Appellee American Marine Tech, Inc. [Entered: 04/23/2021 11:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: American Marine Tech, Inc. v. M/Y Alchemist, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: M/Y ALCHEMIST, a 1995 105 Mangusta recreational vessel, her boats, engines, generators, tackle, rigging, apparel, furniture, furnishings, equipment, contents and appurtenances, etc., in rem
Represented By: Kavan Vartak
Represented By: Clay Michael Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WORLD GROUP YACHTING, INC., in personam
Represented By: Kavan Vartak
Represented By: Clay Michael Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN MARINE TECH, INC.
Represented By: Ryan T. Harris
Represented By: Cullin A. O'Brien
Represented By: David J. Horr
Represented By: Christopher R. Fertig
Represented By: Brian T. Scarry
Represented By: Alexander Philip Koffler
Represented By: Stephanie H. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?