Richard Johnson v. LG Chem, Ltd.
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD JOHNSON
Defendant / Appellee: LG CHEM, LTD.
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Case Number: 21-11826
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Angela Jennifer Nehmens for Appellant Bryan Durham in 21-11814. Updated Deadline - Appellant's brief is due on or before 08/25/2021. Appendix due on 09/01/2021 as to Appellants Bryan Durham, Devin Todd, Doug Newell, Richard Johnson and Dakota Norton. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [21-11814, 21-11817, 21-11821, 21-11826, 21-11828] [Entered: 07/27/2021 11:47 AM]
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Bryan Durham is GRANTED. [ # 9416948-2 ] in 21-11814, Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Devin Todd is GRANTED. [ # 9417043-2 ] in 21-11817, Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Doug Newell is GRANTED. [ # 9416833-2 ] in 21-11821, Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Richard Johnson is GRANTED. [ # 9416842-2 ] in 21-11826, Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Dakota Norton is GRANTED. [ # 9416871-2 ] in 21-11828 JP (See attached order for complete text) [21-11814, 21-11817, 21-11821, 21-11826, 21-11828] [Entered: 07/02/2021 11:53 AM]
July 2, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 07/02/2021 11:12 AM]
June 25, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [21-11814, 21-11816, 21-11817, 21-11819, 21-11821, 21-11822, 21-11826, 21-11827, 21-11828, 21-11829, 21-11834] [Entered: 06/25/2021 03:49 PM]
June 24, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Angela Jennifer Nehmens for Appellant Richard Johnson. [Entered: 06/24/2021 08:48 AM]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to File the Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellant Richard Johnson is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9418813-2 ] [Entered: 06/24/2021 08:47 AM]
June 23, 2021 *DOCKETED IN ERROR. WEB BASED CIP COMPLETED ON 06/22/2021* NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Rachel Atkin Hedley for LG Chem, Ltd.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both.--[Edited 06/25/2021 by TAT] [Entered: 06/23/2021 01:48 PM]
June 23, 2021 MOTION for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Richard Johnson. Motion is Unopposed. [9418813-1] [21-11826]--[Edited 06/24/2021 by CB] (ECF: Angela Nehmens) [Entered: 06/23/2021 05:06 PM]
June 22, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Rachel Atkin Hedley for Appellee LG Chem, Ltd.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11826] (ECF: Rachel Hedley) [Entered: 06/22/2021 02:56 PM]
June 22, 2021 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to consolidate appeals 21-11821, 21-11828, 21-11814, 21-11826, and 21-11817. filed by Richard Johnson. Motion is Unopposed. [9416842-1] [21-11826] (ECF: Angela Nehmens) [Entered: 06/22/2021 01:37 PM]
June 16, 2021 Attorney Alan Charles Dell'Ario for Appellant Richard Johnson has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 06/16/2021 03:43 PM]
June 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alan Charles Dell'Ario for Appellant Richard Johnson [21-11826] (ECF: Angela Nehmens) [Entered: 06/14/2021 07:55 PM]
June 11, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rachel Atkin Hedley for LG Chem, Ltd.. [21-11826] (ECF: Rachel Hedley) [Entered: 06/11/2021 10:50 AM]
June 11, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard B. North, Jr. for LG Chem, Ltd.. [21-11826] (ECF: Richard North) [Entered: 06/11/2021 11:06 AM]
June 8, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Angela Jennifer Nehmens for Appellant Richard Johnson. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11826] (ECF: Angela Nehmens) [Entered: 06/08/2021 08:19 PM]
June 7, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Angela Jennifer Nehmens for Richard Johnson. [21-11826] (ECF: Angela Nehmens) [Entered: 06/07/2021 08:51 PM]
June 7, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Angela Jennifer Nehmens for Appellant Richard Johnson. No hearings. [21-11826] (ECF: Angela Nehmens) [Entered: 06/07/2021 08:52 PM]
May 25, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Richard Johnson on 05/24/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/06/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/08/2021 as to Appellant Richard Johnson. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/22/2021 as to Appellee LG Chem, Ltd. [Entered: 05/28/2021 04:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Richard Johnson v. LG Chem, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD JOHNSON
Represented By: David A. Sleppy
Represented By: Angela Jennifer Nehmens
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Alan Charles Dell'Ario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LG CHEM, LTD.
Represented By: Rachel Atkin Hedley
Represented By: Richard B. North Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: James T. Irvin III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?