Kenneth Morrell v. Theodore Jackson
Petitioner / Appellant: KENNETH L. MORRELL
Respondent / Appellee: THEODORE JACKSON, the official in charge of the Fulton County Jail
Case Number: 21-11862
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction.; Motion for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kenneth L. Morrell is DENIED as MOOT. [ # 9417130-2 ] BCG, RJL and ALB (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 07/26/2021 01:18 PM]
June 22, 2021 MOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kenneth L. Morrell. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9417130-1] [Entered: 06/22/2021 03:16 PM]
June 21, 2021 PREMATURE Appellant's brief filed by Kenneth L. Morrell. [Entered: 07/19/2021 01:58 PM]
June 14, 2021 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Kenneth L. Morrell. [Entered: 06/16/2021 02:45 PM]
May 27, 2021 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Kenneth L. Morrell on 05/24/2021. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 06/02/2021 10:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenneth Morrell v. Theodore Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: KENNETH L. MORRELL
Represented By: Kenneth L. Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: THEODORE JACKSON, the official in charge of the Fulton County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?