Acheron Portfolio Trust, et al v. Barry Mukamal
Plaintiff / Appellant: ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, ACHERON PORTFOLIO TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST and AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST
Defendant / Appellee: BARRY MUKAMAL, as Trustee of the Mututal Benefits Keep Policy Trust and BARRY MUKAMAL, as Trustee of the Mutual Benefits Keep Policy Trust
Case Number: 21-12111
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 4, 2022 Acheron Portfolio Trust, et al. v. Barry Mukamal

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 08/06/2021 12:34 PM]
July 23, 2021 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Barry Mukamal [21-12111] (ECF: John Arrastia) [Entered: 07/23/2021 03:00 PM]
July 23, 2021 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Julissa Rodriguez for Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust pursuant to court order dated 07/09/2021. [21-12111]Corrected docket event type & text--[Edited 07/23/2021 by TLR] (ECF: Julissa Rodriguez) [Entered: 07/23/2021 03:00 PM]
July 21, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David L. Rosendorf for Appellee Barry Mukamal. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12111] (ECF: David Rosendorf) [Entered: 07/21/2021 11:58 AM]
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust, Styx Portfolio Trust and Acheron Portfolio Trust is GRANTED. [ # 9433584-2 ] Appellants brief due on 09/10/2021. BL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 07/19/2021 12:05 PM]
July 19, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David L. Rosendorf for Barry Mukamal. [21-12111] (ECF: David Rosendorf) [Entered: 07/19/2021 11:30 AM]
July 19, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Arrastia, Jr. for Barry Mukamal. [21-12111] (ECF: John Arrastia) [Entered: 07/19/2021 10:27 AM]
July 16, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to John Arrastia, Jr. for Barry Mukamal, Angelo Michael Castaldi for Barry Mukamal and David L. Rosendorf for Barry Mukamal. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. Counsel for appellee should submit the CIP within 3-days of this notice. [Entered: 07/16/2021 05:19 PM]
July 13, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 09/10/2021 filed by Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9433584-1] [21-12111] (ECF: Julissa Rodriguez) [Entered: 07/13/2021 10:02 AM]
July 9, 2021 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. [Entered: 07/09/2021 02:41 PM]
July 2, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Larry I. Glick for Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust, Styx Portfolio Trust and Acheron Portfolio Trust. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 07/02/2021 12:31 PM]
July 1, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Julissa Rodriguez for Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. [21-12111] (ECF: Julissa Rodriguez) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:13 PM]
July 1, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Julissa Rodriguez for Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12111] (ECF: Julissa Rodriguez) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:12 PM]
July 1, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Larry I. Glick for Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. Transcript(s) ordered. [21-12111] (ECF: Larry Glick) [Entered: 07/01/2021 03:08 PM]
June 28, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Julissa Rodriguez for Acheron Portfolio Trust; Avernus Portfolio Trust; Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust; STYX Portfolio Trust; Acheron Capital, Ltd., as investment manager for Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust; STYX Portf [21-12111] (ECF: Julissa Rodriguez) [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:50 PM]
June 28, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Larry I. Glick for Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. [21-12111] (ECF: Larry Glick) [Entered: 06/28/2021 02:03 PM]
June 17, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Acheron Capital, Ltd. on 06/17/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/27/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/01/2021 as to Appellant Acheron Capital, Ltd.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/15/2021 as to Appellee Barry Mukamal [Entered: 06/21/2021 03:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Acheron Portfolio Trust, et al v. Barry Mukamal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD.
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Represented By: Daniel R. Lazaro
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Represented By: Julissa Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Represented By: Daniel R. Lazaro
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Represented By: Julissa Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ACHERON PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Represented By: Daniel R. Lazaro
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Represented By: Julissa Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Represented By: Daniel R. Lazaro
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Represented By: Julissa Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Represented By: Steven L. Schreckinger
Represented By: Daniel R. Lazaro
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Represented By: Julissa Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARRY MUKAMAL, as Trustee of the Mututal Benefits Keep Policy Trust
Represented By: David L. Rosendorf
Represented By: John Arrastia Jr.
Represented By: Angelo Michael Castaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARRY MUKAMAL, as Trustee of the Mutual Benefits Keep Policy Trust
Represented By: John Arrastia Jr.
Represented By: Angelo Michael Castaldi
Represented By: David L. Rosendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?