Communications Workers of America v. BellSouth TeleCommunications, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellee: COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 21-12669
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant BLS. [Entered: 02/04/2022 11:47 AM]
February 2, 2022 Reply Brief filed by Appellant BLS. [21-12669] (ECF: Susan Pangborn) [Entered: 02/02/2022 06:26 PM]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file the appellant's reply brief, to and including February 2, 2022, is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9561416-2 ] Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 12/27/2021 05:15 PM]
December 27, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file reply brief to 02/02/2022 filed by BLS. Motion is Unopposed. [9561416-1] [21-12669] (ECF: Susan Pangborn) [Entered: 12/24/2021 01:53 PM]
December 21, 2021 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee Communications Workers of America. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 12/22/2021 11:39 AM]
December 20, 2021 Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Communications Workers of America. [21-12669] (ECF: Tessa Warren) [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:37 AM]
December 15, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Communications Workers of America. [Entered: 12/16/2021 10:55 AM]
December 13, 2021 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Communications Workers of America. [21-12669] (ECF: Tessa Warren) [Entered: 12/13/2021 05:20 PM]
November 8, 2021 Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellee's Brief is due on 12/13/2021. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 11/08/2021 04:11 PM]
November 4, 2021 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant BLS. 3 VOLUMES - 3 COPIES [Entered: 11/05/2021 03:52 PM]
November 3, 2021 Appendix filed [3 VOLUMES] by Appellant BLS. [21-12669] (ECF: Susan Pangborn) [Entered: 11/03/2021 06:01 PM]
November 1, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant BLS. [Entered: 11/02/2021 11:35 AM]
October 28, 2021 Appellant's brief filed by BLS. [21-12669] (ECF: Susan Pangborn) [Entered: 10/28/2021 07:00 PM]
September 7, 2021 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Noelle A. Abastillas for Appellant BLS. Appellants brief due on 09/28/2021 as to Appellant Bellsouth Telecommunications, Inc.. Appendix due on 10/05/2021 as to Appellant Bellsouth Telecommunications, Inc.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 09/07/2021 03:45 PM]
September 2, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12669] (ECF: Tessa Warren) [Entered: 09/02/2021 02:55 PM]
September 2, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 09/02/2021 03:45 PM]
August 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Susan Wallis Pangborn for BLS. [21-12669] (ECF: Susan Pangborn) [Entered: 08/23/2021 05:24 PM]
August 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Noelle A. Abastillas for BLS. [21-12669] (ECF: Noelle Abastillas) [Entered: 08/23/2021 05:22 PM]
August 23, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Susan Wallis Pangborn for Appellant BLS. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12669] (ECF: Susan Pangborn) [Entered: 08/23/2021 05:33 PM]
August 23, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Susan Wallis Pangborn for Appellant BLS. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [21-12669] (ECF: Susan Pangborn) [Entered: 08/23/2021 05:37 PM]
August 23, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Susan Wallis Pangborn for Appellant BLS. [21-12669] (ECF: Susan Pangborn) [Entered: 08/23/2021 05:35 PM]
August 17, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Tessa Addie-Lee Warren for Communications Workers of America. [21-12669] (ECF: Tessa Warren) [Entered: 08/17/2021 11:07 AM]
August 5, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant BLS on 08/05/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/14/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/19/2021 as to Appellant Bellsouth Telecommunications, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/02/2021 as to Appellee Communications Workers of America. [Entered: 08/09/2021 12:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Communications Workers of America v. BellSouth TeleCommunications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA
Represented By: Tessa Addie-Lee Warren
Represented By: Robert Moore Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Noelle A. Abastillas
Represented By: John W. Alden
Represented By: Susan Wallis Pangborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?