United States v. Evelyn Solomon
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Defendant / Appellant: EVELYN SOLOMON, by and through her Guardian Julia Solomon
Case Number: 21-13833
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joseph A. DiRuzzo, III for Evelyn Solomon. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). [Entered: 12/03/2021 11:31 AM]
November 22, 2021 MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by United States. Motion is Unopposed. [9537939-1] [21-13833] (ECF: Paul Allulis) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:47 PM]
November 22, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael J. Haungs for USA [21-13833] (ECF: Michael Haungs) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:52 PM]
November 18, 2021 Joseph A. DiRuzzo, III for Appellant Evelyn Solomon and Daniel M Lader for Appellant Evelyn Solomon has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 11/18/2021 11:12 AM]
November 18, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joseph A. DiRuzzo, III for Evelyn Solomon and Daniel M Lader for Evelyn Solomon. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/18/2021 11:12 AM]
November 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul A. Allulis for USA [21-13833] (ECF: Paul Allulis) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:33 PM]
November 16, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Paul A. Allulis for USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13833] (ECF: Paul Allulis) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:36 PM]
November 2, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 11/02/2021 as to Appellant Evelyn Solomon. [Entered: 11/02/2021 03:31 PM]
November 2, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Evelyn Solomon on 11/02/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/16/2021 as to Appellant Evelyn Solomon. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/30/2021 as to Appellee United States [Entered: 11/02/2021 03:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. Evelyn Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: John Paul Nasta
Represented By: Emily M. Smachetti
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
Represented By: Paul Andrew Allulis
Represented By: Michael J. Haungs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EVELYN SOLOMON, by and through her Guardian Julia Solomon
Represented By: Joseph A. DiRuzzo III
Represented By: Daniel M. Lader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?