Commodities & Minerals Enterprise, Ltd. v. CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.
Petitioner: COMMODITIES & MINERALS ENTERPRISE, LTD.
Respondent: CVG FERROMINERA ORINOCO C.A.
Case Number: 21-14504
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.. [Entered: 02/24/2022 04:12 PM]
February 22, 2022 Appellant's brief filed by CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.. [21-14504] (ECF: Daniel Vielleville) [Entered: 02/22/2022 03:39 PM]
January 19, 2022 14-Day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Daniel Eric Vielleville for Appellant CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.. Appellants brief due on 02/22/2022 as to Appellant CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.. Appendix due on 03/01/2022 as to Appellant CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 01/19/2022 09:40 AM]
January 19, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 01/19/2022 01:50 PM]
January 12, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael T. Moore for Appellee Commodities & Minerals Enterprise, Ltd.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14504] (ECF: Michael Moore) [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:46 PM]
January 12, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael T. Moore for Commodities & Minerals Enterprise, Ltd.. [21-14504] (ECF: Michael Moore) [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:42 PM]
January 12, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Paul Maloney for Commodities & Minerals Enterprise, Ltd.. [21-14504] (ECF: Brian Maloney) [Entered: 01/12/2022 03:55 PM]
January 12, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel E. Vielleville for CVG FERROMINERA ORINOCO, C.A. Daniel Eric Vielleville for CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.. [21-14504] (ECF: Daniel Vielleville) [Entered: 01/12/2022 10:48 AM]
January 12, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14504] (ECF: Daniel Vielleville) [Entered: 01/12/2022 10:50 AM]
January 12, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Daniel Eric Vielleville for Appellant CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.. [21-14504] (ECF: Daniel Vielleville) [Entered: 01/12/2022 10:51 AM]
January 12, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bruce G. Paulsen for Commodities & Minerals Enterprise, Ltd.. [21-14504] (ECF: Bruce Paulsen) [Entered: 01/12/2022 03:53 PM]
December 30, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A. on 12/30/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/08/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/13/2022 as to Appellant CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/27/2022 as to Appellee Commodities & Minerals Enterprise, Ltd. [Entered: 12/30/2021 02:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Commodities & Minerals Enterprise, Ltd. v. CVG Ferrominera Orinoco C.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COMMODITIES & MINERALS ENTERPRISE, LTD.
Represented By: Brian Paul Maloney
Represented By: Laura E. Miller
Represented By: Michael T. Moore
Represented By: Bruce G. Paulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CVG FERROMINERA ORINOCO C.A.
Represented By: Daniel Eric Vielleville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?