Lonnie Bivins v. BP Exploration & Production Inc, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: LONNIE BIVINS
Defendant / Appellee: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 22-10102
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Marine Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 NOTICE: Pursuant to the Court's February 8, 2022 order, the parties are directed to docket all filings related to this appeal only in no. 22-10099. See no. 22-10099 for all further filings related to this appeal. [22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 02/09/2022 08:16 AM]
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties did not object to the consolidation of these appeals, the following appeals are CONSOLIDATED: appeal nos. 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10 (the "Consolidated Appeals"). AJ (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 02/08/2022 04:03 PM]
February 1, 2022 Letter regarding consolidation of appeals filed by Attorney Kevin Michael Hodges for Appellees BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10102] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:47 AM]
January 27, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Youlin Yuan for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10102] (ECF: Youlin Yuan) [Entered: 01/27/2022 06:05 PM]
January 27, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin M. Hodges for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10102] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 01/27/2022 05:26 PM]
January 18, 2022 NOTICE to Parties [22-10116, 22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:34 PM]
January 13, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Lonnie Bivins on 01/12/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/27/2022 as to Appellant Lonnie Bivins. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/10/2022 as to Appellees [Entered: 01/14/2022 02:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lonnie Bivins v. BP Exploration & Production Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LONNIE BIVINS
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: Stefan G. Bourn
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Jessica Marie Kennedy
Represented By: Sarah A. Long
Represented By: Kalleigh Amber McCoy
Represented By: Francis M. McDonald Jr.
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy III
Represented By: Cecelia Virden
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Youlin Yuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: Stefan G. Bourn
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Jessica Marie Kennedy
Represented By: Sarah A. Long
Represented By: Kalleigh Amber McCoy
Represented By: Francis M. McDonald Jr.
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy III
Represented By: Cecelia Virden
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Youlin Yuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?