USA v. Samori Jodan Smokes
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: SAMORI JODAN SMOKES
Case Number: 22-10180
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Channell Veena Singh for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10180] (ECF: Channell Singh) [Entered: 01/21/2022 12:06 PM]
January 20, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Channell Veena Singh for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia for USA. [22-10180] (ECF: Channell Singh) [Entered: 01/20/2022 02:48 PM]
January 20, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Justin G. Davids for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia for USA. [22-10180] (ECF: Justin Davids) [Entered: 01/20/2022 02:06 PM]
January 18, 2022 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Samori Jodan Smokes on 01/18/2022. Fee Status: IFP Granted. [Entered: 01/20/2022 01:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Samori Jodan Smokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Justin Davids
Represented By: Channell Veena Singh
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SAMORI JODAN SMOKES
Represented By: Samori Jodan Smokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?