Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company, et al v. Peter J. Yanowitch, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MEDMARC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and PROASSURANCE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, d.b.a. Noetic Specialty Insurance
Defendant / Appellee: PETER J. YANOWITCH, JUAN POCH VIVES and YANOWITCH LAW PA, A Florida for profit corporation
Case Number: 22-11092
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Benjamin C. Hassebrock, Esq. on behalf of Peter J. Yanowitch and Yanowitch Law, P.A. [22-11092] (ECF: Benjamin Hassebrock) [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:06 PM]
May 6, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen Anthony Marino, Jr. for Yanowitch Law PA and Peter J. Yanowitch. [22-11092] (ECF: Stephen Marino) [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:08 PM]
May 6, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stephen Anthony Marino, Jr. for Appellees Yanowitch Law PA and Peter J. Yanowitch. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11092] (ECF: Stephen Marino) [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:09 PM]
May 4, 2022 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney James H. Wyman for Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. Appellants brief due on 06/15/2022 as to Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. Appendix due 7 days later. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 05/04/2022 11:51 AM]
April 13, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rory Eric Jurman for Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. [22-11092] (ECF: Rory Jurman) [Entered: 04/13/2022 10:59 AM]
April 11, 2022 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/16/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/11/2022 05:20 PM]
April 11, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney James H. Wyman for Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. No hearings. [Entered: 04/11/2022 02:22 PM]
April 11, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney James H. Wyman for Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. No hearings. [22-11092] (ECF: James Wyman) [Entered: 04/11/2022 02:02 PM]
April 11, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James H. Wyman for Medmarc Casualty Insurance Co. and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Co. d/b/a Noetic Specialty Insurance Co. James H. Wyman for Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. [22-11092] (ECF: James Wyman) [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:06 AM]
April 11, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney James H. Wyman for Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. [22-11092] (ECF: James Wyman) [Entered: 04/11/2022 02:04 PM]
April 11, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James H. Wyman for Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11092] (ECF: James Wyman) [Entered: 04/11/2022 02:05 PM]
April 11, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James H. Wyman for Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11092] (ECF: James Wyman) [Entered: 04/11/2022 02:06 PM]
April 5, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company on 04/05/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/22/2022 as to Appellants Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company and ProAssurance Specialty Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/06/2022 as to Appellees Juan Poch Vives, Peter J. Yanowitch and Yanowitch Law PA [Entered: 04/08/2022 01:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company, et al v. Peter J. Yanowitch, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MEDMARC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: James H. Wyman
Represented By: Rory Eric Jurman
Represented By: Peter Joseph Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PROASSURANCE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, d.b.a. Noetic Specialty Insurance
Represented By: James H. Wyman
Represented By: Rory Eric Jurman
Represented By: Peter Joseph Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER J. YANOWITCH
Represented By: Stephen Anthony Marino Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Hassebrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUAN POCH VIVES
Represented By: Juan Poch Vives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YANOWITCH LAW PA, A Florida for profit corporation
Represented By: Stephen Anthony Marino Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Hassebrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?