TVPX ARS, INC. v. Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company, et al
Defendant / Appellant: GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY, d.b.a. GE Life and Annuity Assurance Company, f.k.a. Life Insurance Company of Virginia
Respondent / Appellee: TVPX ARS, INC.
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Case Number: 22-11185
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Seth D. Ard for Appellee TVPX ARS, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11185] (ECF: Seth Ard) [Entered: 05/13/2022 05:01 PM]
May 4, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/04/2022 12:04 PM]
May 2, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert L. Ashe III for TVPX ARS, Inc. Robert L. Ashe, III for TVPX ARS, Inc.. [22-11185] (ECF: Robert Ashe) [Entered: 04/30/2022 11:27 AM]
April 27, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Claude Norman, Jr. for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. [22-11185] (ECF: Robert Norman) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:51 AM]
April 27, 2022 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/23/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:22 AM]
April 27, 2022 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Eric S. Mattson for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:52 AM]
April 27, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert N. Hochman for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Co. [22-11185] (ECF: Robert Hochman) [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:38 PM]
April 27, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Eric S. Mattson for Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. No hearings. [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:27 AM]
April 27, 2022 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Joseph R. Dosch for Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Appellants brief due on 06/22/2022 as to Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Appendix due on 06/29/2022 as to Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:54 AM]
April 26, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Eric S. Mattson for Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11185] (ECF: Eric Mattson) [Entered: 04/26/2022 07:26 PM]
April 26, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicholas Spear for TVPX ARS, Inc.. [22-11185] (ECF: Nicholas Spear) [Entered: 04/26/2022 06:14 PM]
April 26, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Seth D. Ard for TVPX ARS, Inc.. [22-11185] (ECF: Seth Ard) [Entered: 04/26/2022 06:11 PM]
April 26, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Eric S. Mattson for Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. [22-11185] (ECF: Eric Mattson) [Entered: 04/26/2022 07:23 PM]
April 25, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric S. Mattson for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. [22-11185] (ECF: Eric Mattson) [Entered: 04/25/2022 07:52 PM]
April 25, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Eric S. Mattson for Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. No hearings. [22-11185] (ECF: Eric Mattson) [Entered: 04/25/2022 07:55 PM]
April 25, 2022 Returned Mail was received for Alan N. Greenspan for Not Party Service and Stanley L. Merritt, Jr. for Not Party Service. Address has been verified and updated, and mail has been re-sent. IN RE: April 15, 2022 Letter DKT-2 [Entered: 05/02/2022 09:05 AM]
April 25, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph R. Dosch for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. [22-11185] (ECF: Joseph Dosch) [Entered: 04/25/2022 08:02 PM]
April 11, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company on 04/11/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/29/2022 as to Appellant Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/13/2022 as to Appellee TVPX ARS, Inc. [Entered: 04/15/2022 01:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: TVPX ARS, INC. v. Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY, d.b.a. GE Life and Annuity Assurance Company, f.k.a. Life Insurance Company of Virginia
Represented By: Joseph R. Dosch
Represented By: Eric S. Mattson
Represented By: Robert Claude Norman Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: TVPX ARS, INC.
Represented By: Seth D. Ard
Represented By: Robert L. Ashe III
Represented By: Glenn C. Bridgman
Represented By: Nicholas S. Crown
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Ryan C. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Steven G. Sklaver
Represented By: Nicholas Spear
Represented By: Michael B. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Gary O. Bruce
Represented By: Jason L. Crawford
Represented By: William Gregory Dobson
Represented By: James Clay Fuller
Represented By: Alan N. Greenspan
Represented By: Hardy Gregory Jr.
Represented By: Stanley L. Merritt Jr.
Represented By: Ben B. Philips
Represented By: Mark G. Pitts
Represented By: Kice H. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?