CodeVentures, LLC v. Vital Motion Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CODEVENTURES, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: VITAL MOTION INC., DAVID A. LOVENHEIM, JAY M. EASTMAN, CHRISTIAN D. TVETENSTRAND, TERRY L. BRADLEY and ERIK HIESTER
Case Number: 22-11288
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 06/10/2022 12:45 PM]
June 7, 2022 MOTION for suggestion of death of David A. Lovenheim filed by Attorney Brian Patrick Yates for Appellees Terry L. Bradley, Jay M. Eastman, Erik Hiester, David A. Lovenheim and Christian D. Tvetenstrand. [9687335-1] --[Edited 06/08/2022 by TAT] (ECF: Brian Yates) [Entered: 06/07/2022 11:35 AM]
June 6, 2022 Response to Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Brian Patrick Yates for Appellees Terry L. Bradley, Jay M. Eastman, Erik Hiester, David A. Lovenheim and Christian D. Tvetenstrand. [22-11288] (ECF: Brian Yates) [Entered: 06/06/2022 10:33 AM]
June 6, 2022 TRANSCRIPTS FILED 6/2/2022. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Dawn M. Savino, Filer: CodeVentures, LLC, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 08/18/2021. [Entered: 06/06/2022 11:11 AM]
June 6, 2022 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant CodeVentures, LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/12/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/06/2022 11:12 AM]
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellant CodeVentures, LLC is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9678731-2 ] [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:36 AM]
May 25, 2022 MOTION Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by CodeVentures, LLC. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9678731-1] [22-11288] (ECF: Jeffrey Crockett) [Entered: 05/25/2022 02:09 PM]
May 25, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey B. Crockett for Appellant CodeVentures, LLC. [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:38 AM]
May 23, 2022 Jeffrey B. Crockett for Appellant CodeVentures, LLC and Kevin C. Kaplan for Appellant CodeVentures, LLC has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 05/23/2022 02:34 PM]
May 23, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brian Patrick Yates for Appellees Terry L. Bradley, Jay M. Eastman, Erik Hiester, David A. Lovenheim, Christian D. Tvetenstrand and Vital Motion Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11288] (ECF: Brian Yates) [Entered: 05/23/2022 10:23 AM]
May 9, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Patrick Yates for Terry L. Bradley, Jay M. Eastman, Erik Hiester, David A. Lovenheim, Christian D. Tvetenstrand and Vital Motion Inc.. [22-11288] (ECF: Brian Yates) [Entered: 05/09/2022 04:13 PM]
May 9, 2022 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Dawn M. Savino, 04/29/2022, CodeVentures, LLC, Pre-Trial Proceedings 08/18/2021. [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:44 PM]
May 6, 2022 Court Reporter Acknowledgment submitted by Unknown Reporter. [22-11288] (ECF: Jeffrey Crockett) [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:00 PM]
April 29, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: CodeVentures, LLC, Court Reporter: Unknown Reporter, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 08/18/2021. [Entered: 04/29/2022 02:01 PM]
April 28, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jeffrey B. Crockett for Appellant CodeVentures, LLC. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-11288] (ECF: Jeffrey Crockett) [Entered: 04/28/2022 01:40 PM]
April 27, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jeffrey B. Crockett for Codeventures, LLC Attorney Jeffrey B. Crockett for Appellant CodeVentures, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11288] (ECF: Jeffrey Crockett) [Entered: 04/27/2022 09:20 AM]
April 27, 2022 Notice of deficient Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Jeffrey B. Crockett for CodeVentures, LLC because you have not filed the Appearance of Counsel Form. Counsel may file a Appearance of Counsel form. [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:06 PM]
April 27, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey B. Crockett for CodeVentures, LLC Jeffrey B. Crockett for CodeVentures, LLC. [22-11288] (ECF: Jeffrey Crockett) [Entered: 04/27/2022 01:45 PM]
April 27, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin C. Kaplan for CodeVentures, LLC [22-11288] (ECF: Kevin Kaplan) [Entered: 04/27/2022 01:56 PM]
April 19, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant CodeVentures, LLC on 04/19/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/09/2022 as to Appellant CodeVentures, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/23/2022 as to Appellee David A. Lovenheim [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: CodeVentures, LLC v. Vital Motion Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CODEVENTURES, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Crockett
Represented By: Kevin C. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VITAL MOTION INC.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID A. LOVENHEIM
Represented By: Brian Patrick Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAY M. EASTMAN
Represented By: Brian Patrick Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTIAN D. TVETENSTRAND
Represented By: Brian Patrick Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRY L. BRADLEY
Represented By: Brian Patrick Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIK HIESTER
Represented By: Brian Patrick Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?