M&M Sisters, LLC, et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: M&M SISTERS, LLC, BERTHA MENENDEZ GARCIA and MARIA MENDEZ
Defendant / Appellee: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 22-11290
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Samuel Alexander for Appellants Maria Mendez, M&M Sisters, LLC and Bertha Menendez Garcia. [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:28 PM]
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to reinstate appeal filed by Appellants Maria Mendez, M&M Sisters, LLC and Bertha Menendez Garcia is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9690081-2 ] [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:24 PM]
June 10, 2022 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Bertha Menendez Garcia, M&M Sisters, LLC and Maria Mendez. [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:29 PM]
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Bertha Menendez Garcia, M&M Sisters, LLC and Maria Mendez failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements. See 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4; ORDER: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Bertha Menendez Garcia, M&M Sisters, LLC and Maria Mendez failed to file a Civil Appeal Statement form within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 06/09/2022 11:36 AM]
June 9, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Samuel Alexander for M&M Sisters, LLC, Bertha Menendez Garcia, and Maria Menendez [22-11290] (ECF: Samuel Alexander) [Entered: 06/09/2022 02:13 PM]
June 9, 2022 MOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Bertha Menendez Garcia, M&M Sisters, LLC and Maria Mendez. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9690081-1] [22-11290] (ECF: Samuel Alexander) [Entered: 06/09/2022 04:36 PM]
June 2, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Frantz C. Nelson for M&M Sisters, LLC, et al [22-11290] (ECF: Frantz Nelson) [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:09 PM]
June 2, 2022 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Scottsdale Insurance Company [22-11290] (ECF: Andrew Rock) [Entered: 06/02/2022 01:29 PM]
May 31, 2022 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Frantz C. Nelson for Appellants. Appellants' brief is due on 06/30/2022. Appellants' attorney should file an appearance of counsel form within 3 days from this date. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 05/31/2022 05:06 PM]
May 23, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Andrew Peter Rock for Appellee Scottsdale Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11290] (ECF: Andrew Rock) [Entered: 05/23/2022 04:09 PM]
May 19, 2022 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Bertha Menendez Garcia, M&M Sisters, LLC, Maria Mendez and Scottsdale Insurance Company. [Entered: 05/19/2022 03:13 PM]
May 19, 2022 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Frantz C. Nelson for Maria Mendez, M&M Sisters, LLC and Bertha Menendez Garcia. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 05/19/2022 03:16 PM]
May 11, 2022 Jose P. Font for Appellants Maria Mendez, M&M Sisters, LLC and Bertha Menendez Garcia and Frantz C. Nelson for Appellants Maria Mendez, M&M Sisters, LLC and Bertha Menendez Garcia has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 05/11/2022 12:22 PM]
May 9, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew Peter Rock for Scottsdale Insurance Company. [22-11290] (ECF: Andrew Rock) [Entered: 05/09/2022 01:39 PM]
April 20, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Bertha Menendez Garcia, M&M Sisters, LLC and Maria Mendez on 04/19/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/31/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/09/2022 as to Appellants. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/23/2022 as to Appellee Scottsdale Insurance Company [Entered: 04/25/2022 09:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: M&M Sisters, LLC, et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M&M SISTERS, LLC
Represented By: Jose P. Font
Represented By: Frantz C. Nelson
Represented By: Samuel Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BERTHA MENENDEZ GARCIA
Represented By: Jose P. Font
Represented By: Frantz C. Nelson
Represented By: Samuel Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA MENDEZ
Represented By: Jose P. Font
Represented By: Frantz C. Nelson
Represented By: Samuel Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Andrew Peter Rock
Represented By: Robert L. Rogers III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?