Carrier Corporation v. Technology Research, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Defendant / Appellee: TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH, LLC, f.k.a.Technology Research Corporation
Case Number: 22-11358
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Pursuant to Appellant Carrier Corporation and Appellee Technology Research, LLC's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:46 PM]
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Carrier Corporation is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9663020-2 ] [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:39 PM]
May 6, 2022 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Carrier Corporation. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [9663020-1] [22-11358] (ECF: Kevin Kucharz) [Entered: 05/06/2022 12:23 PM]
May 6, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin T. Kucharz for Carrier Corporation. [22-11358] (ECF: Kevin Kucharz) [Entered: 05/06/2022 12:16 PM]
April 26, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Carrier Corporation on 04/25/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/11/2022 as to Appellant Carrier Corporation. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/25/2022 as to Appellee Technology Research, LLC [Entered: 04/27/2022 03:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Carrier Corporation v. Technology Research, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: Kevin T. Kucharz
Represented By: Richard Ryan Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH, LLC, f.k.a.Technology Research Corporation
Represented By: Michael R. Boorman
Represented By: Christopher Albert Cazin
Represented By: Philip Andrew Henderson
Represented By: Michael Roger Boorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?