Judith Willis v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JUDITH WILLIS
Defendant / Appellee: ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.
Case Number: 22-11569
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Marine Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew Craven for RCL. [22-11569] (ECF: Andrew Craven) [Entered: 06/09/2022 01:24 PM]
June 9, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11569] (ECF: Andrew Craven) [Entered: 06/09/2022 03:14 PM]
May 17, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/17/2022 03:25 PM]
May 16, 2022 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Judith Willis. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/14/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/16/2022 02:40 PM]
May 12, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Luis Alexander Perez for Appellant Judith Willis. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11569] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 05/12/2022 06:07 PM]
May 12, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Luis Alexander Perez for Judith Willis. [22-11569] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 05/12/2022 06:02 PM]
May 12, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Luis Alexander Perez for Appellant Judith Willis. No hearings. [22-11569] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 05/12/2022 06:04 PM]
May 12, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Luis Alexander Perez for Appellant Judith Willis. [22-11569] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 05/12/2022 06:05 PM]
May 5, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Judith Willis on 05/05/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/26/2022 as to Appellant Judith Willis. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/09/2022 as to Appellee Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. [Entered: 05/12/2022 03:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Judith Willis v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUDITH WILLIS
Represented By: Luis Alexander Perez
Represented By: Jacqueline Garcell
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.
Represented By: Andrew Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?