PR Overseas Boating, LTD v. Quick SpA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: PR OVERSEAS BOATING, LTD
Defendant / Appellee: QUICK SPA and THE TALARIA COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 22-11730
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 18, 2023 PR Overseas Boating, LTD v. Quick Spa, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John H. Pelzer for The Talaria Company, LLC. [22-11730] (ECF: John Pelzer) [Entered: 07/19/2022 03:32 PM]
July 12, 2022 ***Docketed in Error*** Response to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to supplement the record filed by Appellee The Talaria Company, LLC. [22-11730]--[Edited 07/12/2022 by JC] (ECF: John Pelzer) [Entered: 07/12/2022 04:14 PM]
July 12, 2022 Response to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to supplement the record filed by Appellee The Talaria Company, LLC. [22-11730] (ECF: John Pelzer) [Entered: 07/12/2022 04:52 PM]
July 11, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Katharine Roth for Appellee Quick SpA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11730] (ECF: Katharine Roth) [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:07 PM]
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Talaria Company, LLCs motion for extension of time for the parties to file responses to the Courts jurisdictional question, to and including July 12, 2022, is GRANTED. [ # 9707004-2 ] JP [Entered: 07/07/2022 08:51 AM]
July 5, 2022 MOTION for extension of time to file a response to the Jurisdictional Question to 07/12/2022 filed by The Talaria Company, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [9707004-1] [22-11730] (ECF: John Pelzer) [Entered: 07/05/2022 03:19 PM]
July 5, 2022 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant PR Overseas Boating, LTD [22-11730] (ECF: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer) [Entered: 07/05/2022 07:33 PM]
July 5, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katharine Roth for Quick USA, Inc. [22-11730] (ECF: Katharine Roth) [Entered: 07/05/2022 11:44 PM]
July 1, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John S. Mills for Quick USA, Inc. [22-11730] (ECF: John Mills) [Entered: 07/01/2022 03:11 PM]
June 21, 2022 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to PR Overseas Boating, LTD. [Entered: 06/21/2022 03:53 PM]
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file the appellant's brief, to and including August 4, 2022, is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9695468-2 ] Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 06/16/2022 04:21 PM]
June 16, 2022 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 08/04/2022 filed by PR Overseas Boating, LTD. Motion is Unopposed. [9695468-1] [22-11730] (ECF: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer) [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:39 PM]
June 14, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John H. Pelzer for Appellee The Talaria Company, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11730] (ECF: John Pelzer) [Entered: 06/14/2022 01:53 PM]
June 10, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 06/10/2022 01:12 PM]
June 6, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John H. Pelzer for The Talaria Company, LLC d/b/a The Hinckley Company [22-11730] (ECF: John Pelzer) [Entered: 06/06/2022 04:55 PM]
June 2, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Molly Ann Chafe Brockmeyer for Appellant PR Overseas Boating, LTD. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11730] (ECF: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer) [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:05 PM]
June 2, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Molly Ann Chafe Brockmeyer for Appellant PR Overseas Boating, LTD. No hearings. [22-11730] (ECF: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer) [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:08 PM]
June 2, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Molly Ann Chafe Brockmeyer for Appellant PR Overseas Boating, LTD. [22-11730] (ECF: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer) [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:09 PM]
June 1, 2022 ***Docketed in Error***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark Andrew Boyle, Sr. for PR Overseas Boating, LTD. [22-11730]--[Edited 06/01/2022 by JC] (ECF: Mark Boyle) [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:12 PM]
June 1, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Molly Ann Chafe Brockmeyer for PR Overseas Boating, LTD. [22-11730] (ECF: Molly Chafe Brockmeyer) [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:16 PM]
June 1, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark Andrew Boyle, Sr. for PR Overseas Boating, LTD. [22-11730] (ECF: Mark Boyle) [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:24 PM]
May 23, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant PR Overseas Boating, LTD on 05/23/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/05/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/08/2022 as to Appellant PR Overseas Boating, LTD. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/22/2022 as to Appellee Quick SpA [Entered: 05/25/2022 03:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: PR Overseas Boating, LTD v. Quick SpA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PR OVERSEAS BOATING, LTD
Represented By: Mark Andrew Boyle Sr.
Represented By: Molly Ann Chafe Brockmeyer
Represented By: Joseph R. Fields Jr.
Represented By: John Richardson Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUICK SPA
Represented By: Jamey Robert Campellone
Represented By: Beth-Ann E. Krimsky
Represented By: John Michael Wermuth
Represented By: John Stewart Mills
Represented By: Katharine Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TALARIA COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Jamey Robert Campellone
Represented By: Michael J. Daly
Represented By: Beth-Ann E. Krimsky
Represented By: Nicole M. Matteo
Represented By: John H. Pelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?