Securities and Exchange Commission v. Michael Furman
Plaintiff / Appellee: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant / Appellant: MICHAEL C. FURMAN
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Case Number: 22-12376
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission [22-12376] (ECF: Brooke Wagner) [Entered: 09/12/2022 12:04 PM]
September 12, 2022 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Michael C. Furman [22-12376] (ECF: Zachary Hyman) [Entered: 09/12/2022 05:36 PM]
August 31, 2022 This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. [Entered: 08/31/2022 12:43 PM]
August 29, 2022 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Michael C. Furman. [Entered: 08/29/2022 02:41 PM]
August 24, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 08/24/2022 03:05 PM]
August 19, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brooke Wagner for Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12376] (ECF: Brooke Wagner) [Entered: 08/19/2022 07:55 AM]
August 19, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Zachary P. Hyman for Appellant Michael C. Furman. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12376] (ECF: Zachary Hyman) [Entered: 08/19/2022 12:08 PM]
August 19, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Zachary P. Hyman for Appellant Michael C. Furman. [22-12376] (ECF: Zachary Hyman) [Entered: 08/19/2022 04:11 PM]
August 18, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Michael C. Furman, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 10/21/2021 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 11/30/2021 ; Transcript Order: Filer: Michael C. Furman, Court Reporter: Ellen Rassie, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/02/2021 ; Transcript Order: Filer: Michael C. Furman, Court Reporter: Unknown Reporter, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 10/06/2021 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 10/25/2021. [Entered: 08/18/2022 11:49 AM]
August 16, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Zachary P. Hyman for Appellant Michael C. Furman. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-12376] (ECF: Zachary Hyman) [Entered: 08/16/2022 04:27 PM]
August 16, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Zachary P. Hyman for Michael C. Furman. [22-12376] (ECF: Zachary Hyman) [Entered: 08/16/2022 04:22 PM]
August 11, 2022 Attorney Zachary P. Hyman for Appellant Michael C. Furman has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement (CAS) and a motion to file the CAS out of time are filed. [Entered: 08/11/2022 12:31 PM]
August 9, 2022 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Zachary P. Hyman for Michael C. Furman. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 08/09/2022 03:40 PM]
August 2, 2022 Notice of deficient Transcript Order Form filed by Zachary P. Hyman for Michael C. Furman. Counsel is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit Bar. Counsel must file an Appearance of Counsel form when admitted to the Eleventh Circuit Bar and re-submit the Transcript Order Form. [Entered: 08/02/2022 05:27 PM]
August 2, 2022 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Zachary P. Hyman for Michael C. Furman is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 08/02/2022 10:16 AM]
August 1, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Zachary P. Hyman for Appellant Michael C. Furman. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-12376] (ECF: Zachary Hyman) [Entered: 08/01/2022 03:21 PM]
August 1, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Zachary P. Hyman for Michael C. Furman. [22-12376] (ECF: Zachary Hyman) [Entered: 08/01/2022 03:20 PM]
July 28, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brooke Wagner for Securities and Exchange Commission [22-12376] (ECF: Brooke Wagner) [Entered: 07/28/2022 03:46 PM]
July 28, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Morgan Bradylyons for SEC [22-12376] (ECF: Morgan Bradylyons) [Entered: 07/28/2022 04:39 PM]
July 18, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Michael C. Furman on 07/18/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/05/2022 as to Appellant Michael C. Furman. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/19/2022 as to Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission [Entered: 07/22/2022 03:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Michael Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Brooke Wagner
Represented By: Amie Berlin
Represented By: Morgan E. A. Bradylyons
Represented By: Martin F. Healey
Represented By: Alise Meredith Johnson
Represented By: Linda Salup-Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL C. FURMAN
Represented By: Zachary P. Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Chris A. Barker
Represented By: George Bochetto
Represented By: David L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alexis Fields
Represented By: Brandon Scott Floch
Represented By: Daniel Scott Fridman
Represented By: Alan S. Futerfas
Represented By: Ronald M. Gache
Represented By: Seth David Haimovitch
Represented By: Katie Brinson Hinton
Represented By: Joel Hirschhorn
Represented By: James Miller Kaplan
Represented By: Allison Beth Kernisky
Represented By: Joshua Robert Levine
Represented By: Jeffrey Eldridge Marcus
Represented By: Jason L. Mays
Represented By: Brian P. Miller
Represented By: Alejandro Paz
Represented By: Andre Raikhelson
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bettina Schein
Represented By: James David Silver
Represented By: Scott A. Simon
Represented By: Daniel Ira Small
Represented By: Noah Elliot Snyder
Represented By: Alejandro O. Soto
Represented By: Chad M. Vanderhoef
Represented By: Damian George Waldman
Represented By: Douglas Keith Wickenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?