Carlton Hooker, Jr. v. USA
Plaintiff / Appellant: CARLTON EUGENE HOOKER, JR.
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 22-12820
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 9, 2023 Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. v. USA

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Sean Siekkinen for Appellee USA. Appellee's Brief due on 11/10/2022 as to Appellee United States of America.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 09/26/2022 11:29 AM]
September 16, 2022 Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES - 7 copies] by Party Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.. Service date: 09/14/2022 US mail - Appellant Hooker; email - Attorney for Appellees: Siekkinen, U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida. [Entered: 09/19/2022 09:55 AM]
September 12, 2022 Appellant's brief filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.. Service date: 09/09/2022 [22-12820] Attorney for Appellee: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida - email. [Entered: 09/12/2022 03:01 PM]
September 12, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sean Siekkinen for USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12820] (ECF: Sean Siekkinen) [Entered: 09/12/2022 11:58 AM]
September 12, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sean Siekkinen for USA [22-12820] (ECF: Sean Siekkinen) [Entered: 09/12/2022 11:54 AM]
September 7, 2022 Appellate fee was paid on 09/07/2022 as to Appellant Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. [Entered: 09/07/2022 02:22 PM]
September 7, 2022 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/17/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/07/2022 03:30 PM]
September 6, 2022 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.. [Entered: 09/08/2022 02:44 PM]
August 24, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. on 08/23/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/08/2022 as to Appellant Carlton Eugene Hooker Jr.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/22/2022 as to Appellee United States of America [Entered: 08/25/2022 04:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Carlton Hooker, Jr. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLTON EUGENE HOOKER, JR.
Represented By: Carlton Eugene Hooker Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Represented By: Sean Siekkinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?