Joseph McClash, et al v. Florida Department of Transportation, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH MCCLASH, JOE KANE, LINDA MOLTO and JANE VON HAHMANN
Defendant / Appellee: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION and SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Case Number: 22-13034
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Marc Peoples for Florida Department of Transportation and Secretary, Florida Department of Transportation is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 10/12/2022 05:38 PM]
October 11, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marc Peoples for Florida Department of Transportation [22-13034] (ECF: Marc Peoples) [Entered: 10/10/2022 03:46 PM]
October 7, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 10/07/2022 05:01 PM]
October 5, 2022 30-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Matthew P. Farmer for Appellants Joseph McClash, Joe Kane, Linda Molto and Jane Von Hahmann. Appellants brief due on 11/21/2022 as to Appellant Jane Von Hahmann. Appendix due on 11/28/2022 as to Appellant Jane Von Hahmann. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 10/05/2022 11:40 AM]
September 26, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew P. Farmer for Jane Von Hahmann, Joe Kane, Joseph McClash and Linda Molto. [22-13034] (ECF: Matthew Farmer) [Entered: 09/26/2022 12:20 PM]
September 26, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Matthew P. Farmer for Appellants Jane Von Hahmann, Joe Kane, Joseph McClash and Linda Molto. [22-13034] (ECF: Matthew Farmer) [Entered: 09/26/2022 12:23 PM]
September 26, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Matthew P. Farmer for Appellants Jane Von Hahmann, Joe Kane, Joseph McClash and Linda Molto. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [22-13034] (ECF: Matthew Farmer) [Entered: 09/26/2022 12:24 PM]
September 26, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13034] (ECF: Matthew Farmer) [Entered: 09/26/2022 12:25 PM]
September 26, 2022 Appellate fee was paid on 09/26/2022 as to Appellant Joseph McClash. [Entered: 09/26/2022 02:25 PM]
September 26, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Matthew P. Farmer for Appellants Joseph McClash, Joe Kane, Linda Molto and Jane Von Hahmann. No hearings. [Entered: 09/26/2022 02:28 PM]
September 26, 2022 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Jane Von Hahmann, Joe Kane, Joseph McClash and Linda Molto. The appellants' brief is due on or before 10/18/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellants' brief. [Entered: 09/26/2022 03:46 PM]
September 8, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Jane Von Hahmann, Joe Kane, Joseph McClash and Linda Molto on 09/07/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/27/2022 as to Appellant Joseph McClash. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/11/2022 as to Appellee Florida Department of Transportation [Entered: 09/13/2022 12:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joseph McClash, et al v. Florida Department of Transportation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH MCCLASH
Represented By: Ralf Brookes
Represented By: Matthew P. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOE KANE
Represented By: Ralf Brookes
Represented By: Matthew P. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LINDA MOLTO
Represented By: Ralf Brookes
Represented By: Matthew P. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANE VON HAHMANN
Represented By: Ralf Brookes
Represented By: Matthew P. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: George Spears Reynolds IV
Represented By: Marc Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Marc Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?